EP0984895 - CRANE WITH TELESCOPE JIB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Demag Mobile Cranes GmbH & Co. KG Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2002/15] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONRAD, Klaus Schmalscheidstrasse 13 D-66500 Hornbach / DE | 02 /
KREBS, Thomas Im Gassengarten 17 D-66440 Blieskastel / DE | 03 /
IRSCH, Michael Brucknerstrasse 6 D-66822 Lebach / DE | 04 /
FERY, Jens Im Birkenfeld 10 D-66125 Saarbrücken / DE | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 98934847.9 | 27.05.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998DE01498 | Priority number, date | DE1997122889 | 28.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19722889 | DE1998124671 | 26.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19824671 | [2000/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9854081 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0984895 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0984895 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/70 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
B66C23/705 (EP,US);
B66C23/708 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | KRAN MIT EINEM TELESKOPAUSLEGER | [2000/11] | English: | CRANE WITH TELESCOPE JIB | [2000/11] | French: | GRUE A FLECHE TELESCOPIQUE | [2000/11] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 20.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.04.2002 | GR | 17.04.2002 | IE | 17.04.2002 | NL | 17.04.2002 | AT | 27.05.2002 | LU | 27.05.2002 | MC | 27.05.2002 | BE | 31.05.2002 | CH | 31.05.2002 | LI | 31.05.2002 | DK | 17.07.2002 | PT | 17.07.2002 | SE | 17.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/39] | GR | 17.04.2002 | |
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
AT | 27.05.2002 | ||
LU | 27.05.2002 | ||
MC | 27.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | GR | 17.04.2002 | |
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
AT | 27.05.2002 | ||
MC | 27.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | GR | 17.04.2002 | |
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
AT | 27.05.2002 | ||
MC | 27.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/47] | GR | 17.04.2002 | |
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
AT | 27.05.2002 | ||
MC | 27.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 17.04.2002 | |
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
MC | 27.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 17.04.2002 | |
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
MC | 27.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | GR | 17.04.2002 | |
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
MC | 27.05.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | GR | 17.04.2002 | |
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | GR | 17.04.2002 | |
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | IE | 17.04.2002 | |
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 17.04.2002 | |
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 17.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1268804 (BETEILIGUNGS & PATENTVERW GMBH) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]DE1944463 (KRUPP GMBH) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0661234 (LIEBHERR WERK EHINGEN [DE]) [AD] 1 * claim 1 * |