EP0981293 - DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE INTRA-OCULAR PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acritec GmbH Lindenstrasse 22 16548 Glienicke / DE | For all designated states Mesotec Gesellschaft für Medizinische Sensortechnik mbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 7 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Acritec GbmH Lindenstrasse 20 16548 Glienicke / DE | ||
For all designated states Mesotec Gesellschaft für Medizinische Sensortechnik mbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 7 30165 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Acritec GbmH Lindenstrasse 20 16548 Glienicke / DE | ||
For all designated states Mesotec Gesellschaft für Medizinische Sensortechnik mbH Bismarckstrasse 120 47057 Duisburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNAKENBERG, Uwe Kullenhofwinkel 36 D-52074 Aachen / DE | 02 /
MOKWA, Wilfried Yorckstrasse 67 D-47800 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
KREINER, Christine Harthauser Strasse 30a D-81545 München / DE | 04 /
RICHTER, Horst Schweilbacher Strasse 59 D-52146 Würselen / DE | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Nöth, Heinz Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Arnulfstrasse 25 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98935012.9 | 01.07.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998EP04072 | Priority number, date | DE1997128069 | 01.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19728069 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9901063 | Date: | 14.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981293 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0981293 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/16, A61B5/00 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
A61B5/0031 (EP,KR,US);
A61B3/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/16 (EP,KR,US);
G02C11/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DES AUGENINNENDRUCKS | [2000/09] | English: | DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE INTRA-OCULAR PRESSURE | [2000/09] | French: | INSTRUMENT A MESURER LA PRESSION INTRA-OCULAIRE | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5005577 (FRENKEL RONALD E P [US]) [DA] 1-4 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4341903 (BINDER JOSEF PROF DR RER NAT [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,8 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 1 ** column 3, line 17 - line 65 * | by applicant | US5005577 | - GREHN, F., LEYDHECKER W., GREHN, F., LEYDHECKER W., 26. AUFLAGE, Augenheilkunde, SPRINGER-VERLAG, vol. 26, pages 244 - 245 |