EP1002165 - BONDING UNIT TO BE FIXED IN A WOOD PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UPAT GMBH & CO Freiburger Strasse 9 79312 Emmendingen / DE | [2002/14] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states UPAT GMBH & CO Freiburger Strasse 9 D-79312 Emmendingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUN, Axel Kannenbecker 17 D-79331 Teningen / DE | 02 /
GRÜN, Jürgen Im Grün 8 D-79268 Bötzingen / DE | 03 /
SCHÄTZLE, Joachim Oberer Zirkel 63 D-79341 Kenzingen / DE | [2000/21] | Application number, filing date | 98935027.7 | 08.07.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998EP04232 | Priority number, date | DE1997214018U | 06.08.1997 Original published format: DE 29714018 U | [2000/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9907956 | Date: | 18.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002165 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1002165 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/26, E04C3/12, F16B11/00 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
E04B1/2604 (EP);
E04C3/12 (EP);
F16B11/008 (EP);
E04B2001/264 (EP);
E04B2001/2652 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT ZUR VERANKERUNG IN EINEM HOLZWERKSTÜCK | [2000/21] | English: | BONDING UNIT TO BE FIXED IN A WOOD PART | [2000/21] | French: | ELEMENT DE LIAISON A FIXER DANS UNE PIECE DE BOIS | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 03.07.2002 | SE | 03.07.2002 | BE | 31.07.2002 | CH | 31.07.2002 | LI | 31.07.2002 | [2003/51] |
Former [2003/46] | DK | 03.07.2002 | |
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | SE | 03.07.2002 | |
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 03.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2584133 (KOOCHEMBERE CHRIS T) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 12 - column 4, line 73; figures 1-4 * [A] 8-10; | [YA]DE3132828 (SELL RUDOLF) [Y] 1-4 * page 12, paragraph L - page 13, paragraph 3; figures 1-3 * [A] 8-10; | [A]EP0263350 (BERTSCHE PETER) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract *; | [A]FR2706802 (WEISROCK ETS ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1,8* abstract * | by applicant | DE4406433 |