EP0942013 - POLYPROPYLENE RESIN COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states Grand Polymer Co., Ltd. Yaesu Katagai Bldg., 18-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAOKA, Tohru-Grand Polymer Co., Ltd. 1, Chikko Shinmachi 3-cho,Sakai-shi Osaka 592-8331 / JP | 02 /
SAKAI, Ikunori-Grand Polymer Co., Ltd. 1, Chikko Shinmachi 3-cho,Sakai-shi Osaka 592-8331 / JP | 03 /
NAKAGAWA, Hideki-Grand Polymer Co., Ltd. 1, Chikko Shinmachi 3-cho,Sakai-shi Osaka 592-8331 / JP | 04 /
HASHIMOTO, Mikio-Grand Polymer Co., Ltd. 1, Chikko Shinmachi 3-cho,Sakai-shi Osaka 592-8331 / JP | 05 /
MATSUURA, Satoshi-Grand Polymer Co., Ltd. 3, Chigusakaigan,Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | 06 /
SHIMIZU, Takashi-Grand Polymer Co., Ltd. 6, Takasago 1-chome,Takaishi-shi Osaka 592-0001 / JP | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98935354.5 | 04.08.1998 | [1999/37] | WO1998JP03470 | Priority number, date | JP19970210385 | 05.08.1997 Original published format: JP 21038597 | [1999/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9907752 | Date: | 18.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0942013 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0942013 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/06, C08F4/646, C08L23/10, C08J5/18, C08J9/10, B29C47/00, B29C55/28 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08F10/06 (KR);
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L2314/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/10, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/11, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/17 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/37] | Title | German: | POLYPROPYLENHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [1999/37] | English: | POLYPROPYLENE RESIN COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF | [1999/37] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE DE POLYPROPYLENE ET UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI | [1999/37] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1999 | Translation filed | 21.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 21.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 22.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0280297 (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17* examples 1-12; claim 1; tables 1,2 *; | EP0498603 [ ] (AMOCO CORP [US]); | [A]EP0736552 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 1; claim 1; tables 1-4 * | International search | [X]JPH04202507 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPH0693034 (HIMONT INC [US]); | [X]JPH08120157 (SHOWA DENKO KK); | [X]JPH09263606 (BASF AG) |