EP0998748 - MINIATURE X-RAY DEVICE HAVING COLD CATHODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic AVE Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [2002/19] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states XRT Corp. 2670 Patton Road St. Paul, MN 55113 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHORNENKY, Victor, I. 5525 Mayview Road Minnetonka, MN 55345 / US | 02 /
FORMAN, Michael, R. 472 Vadnais Lake Drive Vadnais Heights, MN 55127 / US | 03 /
SCHREINER, Dale, L. 9380 County Road 140 Cologne, MN 55322 / US | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Sigh, Erik, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | Sigh, Erik, et al Hofman-Bang A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 98935825.4 | 20.07.1998 | [2000/19] | WO1998US14958 | Priority number, date | US19970900609 | 25.07.1997 Original published format: US 900609 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9905694 | Date: | 04.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998748 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0998748 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01J35/32, H01J35/20, H01J35/06, A61N5/10 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
A61N5/1001 (EP,US);
H01J35/32 (EP,KR,US);
A61N5/1002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/19] | Title | German: | MINIATUR-RÖNTGENVORRICHTUNG MIT KALTKATHODE | [2000/19] | English: | MINIATURE X-RAY DEVICE HAVING COLD CATHODE | [2000/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RADIOGRAPHIE MINIATURE COMPORTANT UNE CATHODE FROIDE | [2005/23] |
Former [2000/19] | DISPOSITIF DE RADIOGRAPHIE MINIATURE COMPORTANT UNE ELECTRODE FROIDE | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 12.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.2005 | BE | 26.10.2005 | CH | 26.10.2005 | CY | 26.10.2005 | FI | 26.10.2005 | FR | 26.10.2005 | IT | 26.10.2005 | LI | 26.10.2005 | NL | 26.10.2005 | DK | 26.01.2006 | GR | 26.01.2006 | SE | 26.01.2006 | DE | 27.01.2006 | ES | 06.02.2006 | PT | 27.03.2006 | GB | 20.07.2006 | IE | 20.07.2006 | LU | 20.07.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
DE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
GB | 20.07.2006 | ||
IE | 20.07.2006 | ||
LU | 20.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
DE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
GB | 20.07.2006 | ||
IE | 20.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
DE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
GB | 20.07.2006 | ||
IE | 20.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
DE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH08153460 ; | [Y]GB230183 (RUBEN SAMUEL) [Y] 1,12 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US2173258 (LEDERER ERNEST A); | [A]GB997352 (IND DISTRIBUTORS 1946 LTD); | [A]US3582702 (ALMER FRIEDRICH HERMANN RAYMUN); | [A]US4164680 (VILLALOBOS HUMBERTO F [US]) [A] 9,12 * column 9, line 31 - column 10 *; | [A]EP0359724 (GETTERS SPA [IT]) [A] 12 * claim 4 *; | [A]US5090043 (PARKER WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,4 *; | [A]FR2672734 (FUTABA DENSHI KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1,7,12 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0572170 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]EP0718864 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [A]WO9706549 (TUCK RICHARD ALLAN [GB], et al) [A] 1 * claims 32-52 *; | [Y]WO9707740 (INTERVENTIONAL INNOVATIONS COR [US]) [Y] 1,12 * claims 1-18 *; | [E]EP0860180 (INTERVENTIONAL INNOVATIONS COR [US]) [E] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [E]EP0860181 (INTERVENTIONAL INNOVATIONS COR [US]) [E] 1* column 7, line 28 - line 35; figure 3; claims 1-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 096, no. 010, & JP08153460 A 19960611 (CANON INC) [A] 12 * abstract * |