EP1003381 - EDIBLE WATER-IN-OIL DISPERSIONS AND METHOD FOR THEIR PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coop Schweiz Thiersteinerallee 12 4053 Basel / CH | [2000/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Werner Schulgartenstrasse 8 CH-4410 Liestal / CH | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Hans, et al A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | Zimmermann, Hans, Dr., et al A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 98936062.3 | 10.08.1998 | [2000/22] | WO1998CH00335 | Priority number, date | CH19970001906 | 12.08.1997 Original published format: CH 190697 | [2000/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908542 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1003381 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1003381 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23D7/00, A23D7/015 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
A23D7/015 (EP);
A23D7/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [2000/22] | Title | German: | ESSBARE WASSER-IN-ÖL-DISPERSIONEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2000/22] | English: | EDIBLE WATER-IN-OIL DISPERSIONS AND METHOD FOR THEIR PRODUCTION | [2000/22] | French: | DISPERSIONS EAU DANS HUILE COMESTIBLES ET METHODE POUR LEUR PREPARATION | [2000/49] |
Former [2000/22] | DISPERSIONS EAU DANS HUILE COMESTIBLES | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6185140 ; | [A]JPS59102356 ; | [DA]EP0032808 (UNILEVER PLC ;UNILEVER NV (NL)) [DA] 1 * example 3 *; | [A]US4447463 (ANTENORE DONALD E ET AL) [A] 1 * claims 1-8 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 24, Database accession no. 86-152418, XP002085812 & JPS6185140 A 19860430 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 84, no. 30, Database accession no. 84-184616, XP002085813 & JPS59102356 A 19840613 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PRAJAPATI P S ET AL, "Ingredient selection for production of a low-fat butter flavoured spread.", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, INDIA, SMC Coll. of Dairy Sci., Gujarat Agric. Univ., Anand Campus, Anand, Gujarat, India, (1991), vol. 28, no. 4, pages 204 - 207, XP002085811 [A] 1 * the whole document * |