EP0937343 - TRANSMISSION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM EMPLOYING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOULSLEY, Timothy, James Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Tangena, Antonius Gerardus, et al Philips Electronics UK Ltd. Cross Oak Lane Red Hill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Tangena, Antonius Gerardus, et al Philips Electronics UK Ltd., Cross Oak Lane Red Hill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98936600.0 | 13.08.1998 | [1999/34] | WO1998IB01246 | Priority number, date | GB19970018743 | 05.09.1997 Original published format: GB 9718743 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9913603 | Date: | 18.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0937343 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0937343 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06, H04J14/08 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
H04J3/1688 (EP,US);
H04J3/1694 (KR);
H04B7/2643 (KR);
H04J3/0638 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/34] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, DAS DIESES VERFAHREN VERWENDET | [1999/34] | English: | TRANSMISSION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM EMPLOYING THE METHOD | [1999/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION ET SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION METTANT EN OEUVRE CE PROCEDE | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.07.2006 | ES | 30.10.2006 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | ES | 30.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP4127735 ; | [A]US5086425 (LE GOFFIC YVES H M [FR], et al); | [A]US5319707 (WASILEWSKI ANTHONY J [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; & JP 4127735 A (FUJITSU LTD) 28 April 1992., & JP4127735 A 19920428 |