EP1039929 - ACTIVATED T-CELLS AND THEIR USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YEDA RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT Co. Ltd. Weizman Institute of Science, Stone Administration Building, Herzl Street Rehovot 76100 / IL | [2000/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EISENBACH-SCHWARTZ, Michal Rupin Street 5 76353 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
COHEN, Irun, R. Hankin Street 21 76354 Rehovot / IL | 03 /
HIRSCHBERG, David, L. Apartment 3, 919 Fremont Place Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/05] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/40] | Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene, et al Borenius & Co Oy Ab, Kansakoulukuja 3 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98936862.6 | 21.07.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998US14715 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9934827 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1039929 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/35, A61K45/00, A01N63/00 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
A61K39/0007 (EP);
A61K38/1709 (EP);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4621 (EP);
A61K39/46433 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/40] | Extension states | AL | 02.02.2000 | LT | 02.02.2000 | LV | 02.02.2000 | MK | 02.02.2000 | RO | 02.02.2000 | SI | 02.02.2000 | Title | German: | AKTIVIERTEN T-ZELLEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2000/40] | English: | ACTIVATED T-CELLS AND THEIR USES | [2000/40] | French: | LYMPHOCYTES ACTIVES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2000/40] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 22.04.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y] - LOHSE A W, ET AL., "CONTROL OF EXPERIMENTAL AUTOIMMUNE ENCEPHALOMYELITIS BY T CELLS RESPONDING TO ACTIVATED T CELLS", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19890519), vol. 244, doi:10.1126/science.2471264, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 820 - 822, XP002913568 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2471264 | [Y] - YUEN M.-H., ET AL., "IMMUNOREGULATORY CD8+ CELLS RECOGNIZE ANTIGEN-ACTIVATED CD4+ CELLS IN MYASTHENIA GRAVIS PATIENTS AND IN HEALTHY CONTROLS.", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, The American Association of Immunologists, US, US, (19950101), vol. 154., no. 03., ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1508 - 1520., XP002913569 | [Y] - LOHSE A. W., ET AL., "INHIBITION OF THE MIXED LYMPHOCYTE REACTION BY T CELL VACCINATION.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, Wiley - V C H Verlag GmbH & Co. KGaA, DE, DE, (19901101), vol. 20., doi:10.1002/eji.1830201126, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 2521 - 2524., XP002913570 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830201126 | [Y] - LOHSE A. W., ET AL., "INDUCTION OF THE ANTI-ERGOTYPIC RESPONSE.", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY., OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS., GB, GB, (19930501), vol. 05., no. 05., ISSN 0953-8178, pages 533 - 539., XP002913571 | [Y] - BROD S, ET AL., "AUTOLOGOUS T-T CELL ACTIVATION MEDIATED BY CELL ADHESION MOLECULES", The FASEB Journal, Federation of American Societies for Experimental Biology, US, US, (19890101), vol. 03, no. 03, ISSN 0892-6638, page A514, XP002913572 |