EP1012511 - IMPROVED TRANSFER SYSTEM FOR CRYOGENIC LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chart Inc. 407 7th Street N.W., P.O. Box 234 New Prague, MN 56071 / US | [2006/17] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states Chart Inc. 407 7th Street N.W., P.O. Box 234 New Prague, MN 56071 / US | ||
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states Chart, Inc. 407 7th Street N.W., P.O. Box 234 New Prague, MN 56071 / US | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Minnesota Valley Engineering, Inc. 407 Seventh Street N.W., Box 234 New Prague Minnesota 56071-0234 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRUBE, Thomas, K. 16785 Hershey Court Lakeville, MN 55044 / US | 02 /
DRUBE, Paul, A. 15841 Griffon Path Apple Valley, MN 55124 / US | 03 /
PRESTON, A., Duane 803 Ecipse Parkway New Prague, MN 56071 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 98938317.9 | 05.08.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998US16179 | Priority number, date | US19970906512 | 05.08.1997 Original published format: US 906512 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908054 | Date: | 18.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012511 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1012511 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F25B19/00, F17C7/00, F17C7/02, F17C7/04, F17C9/00, F17C9/02 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
F17C7/02 (EP,US);
F17C2221/033 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0161 (EP,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,US);
F17C2225/0161 (EP,US);
F17C2225/033 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0114 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0393 (EP,US);
F17C2250/01 (EP,US);
F17C2250/032 (EP,US);
F17C2260/02 (EP,US);
F17C2265/065 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR KRYOGENE FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2000/26] | English: | IMPROVED TRANSFER SYSTEM FOR CRYOGENIC LIQUIDS | [2000/26] | French: | SYSTEME AMELIORE DE TRANSFERT DE LIQUIDES CRYOGENIQUES | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 12.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2006 | CH | 26.04.2006 | CY | 26.04.2006 | FI | 26.04.2006 | LI | 26.04.2006 | DK | 26.07.2006 | SE | 26.07.2006 | GR | 27.07.2006 | LU | 05.08.2006 | IE | 08.08.2006 | PT | 26.09.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
GR | 27.07.2006 | ||
LU | 05.08.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
GR | 27.07.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 08.08.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 26.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2035396 (MESINGER WILLIAM F) [A] 1-23 * column 6, lines 29-65 * * column 8, lines 7-46 *; | [A]US2037714 (GAINES JR JOHN M) [A] 1-23 * column 5, line 21 - column 8, line 62 *; | [A]GB472471 (LINDE AIR PROD CO) [A] 1-23 * column 7, line 43 - column 10, line 116 *; | [A]US3710584 (LEONARD K) [A] 1-23 * column 3, line 51 - column 6, line 25 *; | [A]US5121609 (CIESLUKOWSKI ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1-23* column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 27 *; | [A]US5537824 (GUSTAFSON KEITH W [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 2, lines 26,44; figure 3 * * column 5, line 27 * * column 6, lines 14-31 * | International search | [A]US5505232 (BARCLAY JOHN A [CA]); | [X]US5537824 (GUSTAFSON KEITH W [US], et al); | [A]US5548962 (LUGER PETER [DE], et al); | [AP]US5687776 (FORGASH DAVID JOHN [US], et al); | [AP]US5699839 (DEHNE HANS-JOACHIM [US]) |