EP1003788 - HIGH INTERNAL PHASE EMULSIONS AND POROUS MATERIALS PREPARED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [2000/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORK, Steve, W. 4302 Robinhood Terrace Midland, MI 48642 / US | 02 /
SOLC, Jitka, H. 4310 James Drive Midland, MI 48642 / US | 03 /
PARK, Chung, P. Schulstrasse 10a D-76532 Baden-Baden / DE | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98938468.0 | 10.08.1998 | [2000/22] | WO1998US16596 | Priority number, date | US19970055852P | 15.08.1997 Original published format: US 55852 P | US19980098259 | 16.06.1998 Original published format: US 98259 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9909070 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1003788 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/32, C08F2/44, C08J9/28, B32B5/18 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
B32B5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/283 (EP,KR);
B32B27/065 (US);
B32B5/022 (US);
B32B5/245 (US);
B32B5/32 (US);
C08F2/32 (EP,KR);
C08F2/44 (EP,KR);
B32B2266/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/22] | Title | German: | EMULSIONEN MIT GROSSER INNERER PHASE UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE PORÖSE MATERIALIEN | [2000/22] | English: | HIGH INTERNAL PHASE EMULSIONS AND POROUS MATERIALS PREPARED THEREFROM | [2000/22] | French: | EMULSIONS A FORTE PHASE INTERNE ET MATIERES POREUSES PREPAREES A PARTIR DE CES EMULSIONS | [2000/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 12.04.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 11.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1458203 (WILL G) [X] 1-4,8,17,18,20-34,42 * page 2, line 10 - line 13 * * page 3, line 59 - page 4, line 32 * * page 11, line 39 - line 71 * * claims 1,2,7,8 *; | [X]WO9640823 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-9,20-28,30-32 * page 13, line 25 - page 18, line 5 * * page 22, line 5 - page 23, line 19 * * claims 1,8,10 *; | [X]WO9621474 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-7,20-28,30,31 * page 12, line 10 - page 13, line 13 * * page 14, line 17 - page 17, line 30 *; | [X]US5632737 (STONE KEITH JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 17, line 57 - line 59; claims 3,7 *; | [A]DE2851045 (WILL GUENTHER DR MED) [A] 1-4,8-11 * page 4, paragraph 3; claim . *; | [X]US4473611 (HAQ ZIA [GB]) [X] 1,2,27,28,30,31 * column 5, line 29 - line 42; claims 1,14-16 * |