EP0934115 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A CATALYST BASED ON COBALT AND SCANDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale E. Mattei, 1 00144 Rome / IT | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale Enrico Mattei 1 00144 Roma / IT | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | |||
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states AGIP PETROLI S.p.A. Via Laurentina 449 00142 Roma / IT | ||
For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale Enrico Mattei 1 00144 Roma / IT | |||
For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENNARO, Roberto Calle Zugna, 12 I-30132 Venezia / IT | 02 /
GUSSO, Andrea Calle Catapan, 618/R I-30122 Venezia / IT | 03 /
CHAUMETTE, Patrick 32, côte de la Jonchère F-78380 Bougival / FR | [1999/32] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98938643.8 | 20.06.1998 | [1999/32] | WO1998EP03873 | Priority number, date | IT1997MI01510 | 26.06.1997 Original published format: IT MI971510 | [1999/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9900190 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0934115 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0934115 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/83, B01J37/02, C07C1/04 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
B01J23/83 (EP,US);
B01J37/0205 (EP,US);
C07C1/0445 (EP,US);
C07C2521/04 (EP,US);
C07C2521/06 (EP,US);
C07C2521/08 (EP,US);
C07C2521/10 (EP,US);
C07C2523/06 (EP,US);
C07C2523/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KATALYSATORS AUF DER BASIS VON KOBALT UND SCANDIUM | [1999/32] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A CATALYST BASED ON COBALT AND SCANDIUM | [1999/32] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION D'UN CATALYSEUR A BASE DE COBALT ET DE SCANDIUM | [1999/32] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4585798 (BEUTHER HAROLD [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,6-8* column 3, line 4 - line 25; claim 1 *; | [DYX]WO9305000 (BROKEN HILL PTY CO LTD [AU]) [DY] 1-5 * page 6, line 31 - page 8, line 10 * [X] 6-8; | [A]WO9404476 (BROKEN HILL PTY CO LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,3-8 * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 19 *; | [Y]EP0756895 (AGIP PETROLI [IT], et al) [Y] 1-5 * claims 1-4,6-9 * |