EP0941584 - METHOD OF OPTIMIZING TRANSMISSION, AND TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIIRAINEN, Olli Pikisaarentie 1 E 11 FIN-90100 Oulu / FI | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani, et al Kolster Oy Ab Elektroniikkatie 8 90590 Oulu / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani, et al Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1999/37] | Pakanen, Henrik Jorma, et al Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98938721.2 | 13.08.1998 | [1999/37] | WO1998FI00625 | Priority number, date | FI19970003337 | 14.08.1997 Original published format: FI 973337 | [1999/37] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9909676 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0941584 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0941584 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H04B7/02, H04B1/04 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
H04W52/343 (EP,US);
H04W52/346 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNGSOPTIMIERUNG UND SENDER | [1999/37] | English: | METHOD OF OPTIMIZING TRANSMISSION, AND TRANSMITTER | [1999/37] | French: | PROCEDE D'OPTIMISATION DE LA TRANSMISSION ET EMETTEUR | [1999/37] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.1998 | Translation filed | 23.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2006 | BE | 04.10.2006 | CH | 04.10.2006 | CY | 04.10.2006 | FI | 04.10.2006 | LI | 04.10.2006 | NL | 04.10.2006 | DK | 04.01.2007 | SE | 04.01.2007 | GR | 05.01.2007 | PT | 16.03.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 04.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4850037 (BOCHMANN HARALD [DE]); | [A]EP0735702 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]WO9708841 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [A]CA2211619 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) | Examination | EP0565505 |