EP1005413 - THE FORMATION OF INDICIA IN THE BASE OF A BLISTER PACK FOR TRANSFERENCE TO A BODY CAST THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.P. SCHERER CORPORATION 2301 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 222 Troy Michigan 48007-7060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states R.P. SCHERER CORPORATION 2301 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 222 Troy, Michigan 48007-7060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEARNEY, Patrick 59 Belsay, Toothill Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 8RJ / GB | 02 /
DAVIES, Mark 11 Kenwin Close, Stratton St. Margaret Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 4NY / GB | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Weyland, J.J. Pierre Marks & Clerk B.P. 1775 1017 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Weyland, J.J. Pierre Marks & Clerk, 6 Rue Glesener, BP 1775 1017 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 98938817.8 | 14.08.1998 | [2000/23] | WO1998GB02442 | Priority number, date | GB19970017491 | 18.08.1997 Original published format: GB 9717491 | GB19970018382 | 29.08.1997 Original published format: GB 9718382 | [2000/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908857 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1005413 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1005413 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/08, A61J1/03, B65D75/34, B29C67/00, B29C51/14 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
B29C59/026 (EP,US);
B29C33/424 (EP,US);
B29C51/08 (EP,US);
B29C51/14 (EP,US);
B29C67/0029 (EP,US);
A61J1/035 (EP,US);
B29C2791/001 (EP,US);
B29C33/0011 (EP,US);
B29C33/42 (EP,US);
B29C51/082 (EP,US);
B29C59/02 (EP,US);
B29K2705/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/23] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON MARKIERUNGEN IM BODEN VON BLISTERVERPACKUNGEN DIE AUF KÖRPER, DIE IN DIESEN BLISTERVERPACKUNGEN GEFORMT WERDEN ,ÜBERTRAGEN WERDEN | [2000/23] | English: | THE FORMATION OF INDICIA IN THE BASE OF A BLISTER PACK FOR TRANSFERENCE TO A BODY CAST THEREIN | [2000/23] | French: | FORMATION DE REPERES DANS LA BASE D'UN EMBALLAGE COQUE PERMETTANT DE TRANSFERER CES DERNIERS SUR UN CORPS COULE DANS L'EMBALLAGE COQUE | [2000/23] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 29.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.05.2002 | BE | 08.05.2002 | CH | 08.05.2002 | FI | 08.05.2002 | GR | 08.05.2002 | LI | 08.05.2002 | NL | 08.05.2002 | DK | 08.08.2002 | PT | 08.08.2002 | SE | 08.08.2002 | CY | 31.08.2002 | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/10] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
CY | 31.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 08.05.2002 | |
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2002/46] | SE | 08.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4001440 (HOYT EARL) [A] * figure - *; | [DA]EP0646367 (SCHERER LTD R P [GB]) [DA] 1* column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5457895 (THOMPSON ANDREW R [GB], et al) [A] 1,6,16 * column 4, lines 25-74; figures 3,4; claims 5-8 *; | [A]WO9710162 (PHARMACIA & UPJOHN AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,6,16 * abstract *; | [A]EP0779143 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [A] * figure - * |