EP0995032 - STREAM TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SINVENT AS 7034 Trondheim / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states Sinvent AS 7034 Trondheim / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARSTENS, Torkild Aunevegen 16 N-7021 Trondheim / NO | 02 /
SPIDSÖE, Nils Övre Ferstadveg 14A N-7022 Trondheim / NO | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98939027.3 | 06.07.1998 | [2000/17] | WO1998NO00202 | Priority number, date | NO19970003136 | 07.07.1997 Original published format: NO 973136 | [2000/17] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9902853 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995032 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0995032 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F03B17/06, F03B13/12 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
F03B17/063 (EP);
F03B13/264 (EP);
Y02E10/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/17] | Title | German: | TURBINE FÜR MEERESSTRÖMUNGEN | [2000/17] | English: | STREAM TURBINE | [2000/17] | French: | TURBINE POUR COURANT MARIN | [2000/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.1999 | Translation filed | 28.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 24.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.11.2003 | BE | 19.11.2003 | CH | 19.11.2003 | FI | 19.11.2003 | FR | 19.11.2003 | IT | 19.11.2003 | LI | 19.11.2003 | NL | 19.11.2003 | DK | 19.02.2004 | GR | 19.02.2004 | SE | 19.02.2004 | DE | 20.02.2004 | ES | 02.03.2004 | PT | 19.04.2004 | GB | 06.07.2004 | IE | 06.07.2004 | LU | 06.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 19.11.2003 | |
BE | 19.11.2003 | ||
CH | 19.11.2003 | ||
FI | 19.11.2003 | ||
FR | 19.11.2003 | ||
LI | 19.11.2003 | ||
NL | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
DE | 20.02.2004 | ||
ES | 02.03.2004 | ||
GB | 06.07.2004 | ||
IE | 06.07.2004 | ||
LU | 06.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 19.11.2003 | |
BE | 19.11.2003 | ||
CH | 19.11.2003 | ||
FI | 19.11.2003 | ||
LI | 19.11.2003 | ||
NL | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
DE | 20.02.2004 | ||
ES | 02.03.2004 | ||
GB | 06.07.2004 | ||
IE | 06.07.2004 | ||
LU | 06.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 19.11.2003 | |
BE | 19.11.2003 | ||
CH | 19.11.2003 | ||
FI | 19.11.2003 | ||
LI | 19.11.2003 | ||
NL | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
DE | 20.02.2004 | ||
ES | 02.03.2004 | ||
IE | 06.07.2004 | ||
LU | 06.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 19.11.2003 | |
BE | 19.11.2003 | ||
CH | 19.11.2003 | ||
FI | 19.11.2003 | ||
LI | 19.11.2003 | ||
NL | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
DE | 20.02.2004 | ||
ES | 02.03.2004 | ||
LU | 06.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 19.11.2003 | |
BE | 19.11.2003 | ||
CH | 19.11.2003 | ||
FI | 19.11.2003 | ||
LI | 19.11.2003 | ||
NL | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
DE | 20.02.2004 | ||
ES | 02.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 19.11.2003 | |
BE | 19.11.2003 | ||
CH | 19.11.2003 | ||
FI | 19.11.2003 | ||
LI | 19.11.2003 | ||
NL | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
DE | 20.02.2004 | ||
ES | 02.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 19.11.2003 | |
CH | 19.11.2003 | ||
FI | 19.11.2003 | ||
LI | 19.11.2003 | ||
NL | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
DE | 20.02.2004 | ||
ES | 02.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 19.11.2003 | |
CH | 19.11.2003 | ||
FI | 19.11.2003 | ||
LI | 19.11.2003 | ||
NL | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
DE | 20.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 19.11.2003 | |
CH | 19.11.2003 | ||
FI | 19.11.2003 | ||
LI | 19.11.2003 | ||
NL | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 19.11.2003 | |
CH | 19.11.2003 | ||
FI | 19.11.2003 | ||
LI | 19.11.2003 | ||
NL | 19.11.2003 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 19.11.2003 | |
FI | 19.11.2003 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 19.11.2003 | |
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 19.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2730631 (DANDINI JULIANA S); | [Y]US3922012 (HERZ HARRY); | [Y]US4301377 (RYDZ LEON); | [X]US4383182 (BOWLEY WALLACE W [US]); | [X]US4748808 (HILL EDWARD D [US]); | [Y]US4864152 (PEDERSEN HANS M [DK]) |