EP0937012 - TEMPERATURE AND SCRATCH-RESISTANT ANTI-STICKING COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. GmbH & Co. Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 D-33332 Gütersloh / DE | [1999/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERKENKÖTTER, Herbert Zum Feldbusch 4 D-59302 Oelde / DE | 02 /
KAUP, Friedel Holzrichterstrasse 16 D-33332 Gütersloh / DE | 03 /
KRÜMPELMANN, Thomas Sternenweg 1 D-33332 Gütersloh / DE | 04 /
MANGEN, Walter Parkstrasse 54 D-33332 Gütersloh / DE | 05 /
SILLMEN, Ulrich Eggestrasse 76 D-33332 Gütersloh / DE | [1999/34] | Application number, filing date | 98940130.2 | 03.07.1998 | [1999/34] | WO1998EP04126 | Priority number, date | DE1997128813 | 05.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19728813 | [1999/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9902463 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937012 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0937012 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/00, C23D13/00, C04B41/81, F24C14/02, A47J36/02 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
A47J36/02 (EP,US);
C03C17/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/4961 (EP,US);
C04B41/84 (EP,US);
C23C26/00 (EP,US);
C23D13/00 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00965 (EP,US);
C04B2111/203 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B33/00 (US,EP);
C04B41/4961, C04B41/4556, C04B41/5392 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/34] | Title | German: | TEMPERATURBESTÄNDIGE UND KRATZFESTE ANTIHAFTBESCHICHTUNG | [1999/34] | English: | TEMPERATURE AND SCRATCH-RESISTANT ANTI-STICKING COATING | [1999/34] | French: | REVETEMENT ANTI-ADHERENCE RESISTANT AUX TEMPERATURES ELEVEES ET AUX RAYURES | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 04.08.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 25.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]AU524276B (SHARP KK) [A] 2,4,5,7,14-20 * claims 1,14-16 * * page 3, line 2 - line 12 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 1 ** page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 2 *; | [XA]EP0492417 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,17,18 * claims 1,5,7 * * figures 1-3; example 1 * * page 5, line 37 - page 6, line 25 * [A] 7-9,14; | [XA]US5435839 (OGAWA KAZUFUMI [JP]) [X] 1-6,17,18 * figures 4,5; examples 9,10 * * column 11, line 11 - column 12, line 14 * [A] 7-9,14 |