EP1025386 - ILLUMINATING BODY FOR SWIMMING POOLS AND SIMILAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WTS Kereskedelmi Es Szolgáltato Korlatolt Felelösségü Társasag Közuzo u. 7 2000 Szentendre / HU | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states WTS Kereskedelmi Es Szolgáltato Korlatolt Felelösségü Társasag Közuzo u. 7 2000 Szentendre / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FICSOR, Istvan Szabadság u. 8 H-2049 Diosd / HU | [2001/04] |
Former [2000/32] | 01 /
FICSOR, Istvan Szabadság u. 8 H-2049 Di®sd / HU | Representative(s) | Vomberg, Friedhelm RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Kaiserswerther Straße 215 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Vomberg, Friedhelm, Dipl.-Phys. Schulstrasse 8 42653 Solingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98940506.3 | 15.09.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998IB01426 | Priority number, date | DE19971047980 | 30.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19747980 | [2000/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9923413 | Date: | 14.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1025386 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1025386 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F21K7/00, F21V31/00 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
F21S8/00 (EP,US);
A61H33/6063 (EP);
F21V31/00 (EP);
F21V33/004 (EP);
F21W2131/401 (EP);
F21Y2107/50 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/32] | F21P7/00, F21K7/00, F21V31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSKÖRPER FÜR SCHWIMMBÄDER UND ÄHNLICHES | [2000/32] | English: | ILLUMINATING BODY FOR SWIMMING POOLS AND SIMILAR | [2000/32] | French: | APPAREIL D'ECLAIRAGE POUR PISCINES ET ANALOGUE | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 19.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9107641 (UNIVERSAL FIBER OPTICS INC [US]) [A] 1* page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 18; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE4327199 (HOLZ RUNOLT [DE]) [Y] 1,5-8 * column 3, line 14 - line 52 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE29704335U (QUICK HERBERT [DE]) [Y] 1,5-8 * page 3, line 9 - line 22 * * page 3, line 39 - page 4, line 13; figures 1,2; claims 3,5 *; | [A]DE29706735U (SPITZ JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 12; figure 1 * | by applicant | GB2239702 |