EP1017774 - BLEACHING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINZMAN, Stephen, Wayne Deleval Old Vicarage, Seaton Sluice Whitley Bay NE26 4QW / GB | 02 /
OUBRAHIM, Youssaf Sint Paulvslaan 111 B-3080 Tervuren / BE | 03 /
ROWLAND, Geoffrey, William 48 Peterborough Way, Fellgate Estate Jarrow, Tyne & Weat NE32 4XE / GB | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98940516.2 | 17.09.1998 | [2000/28] | WO1998IB01438 | Priority number, date | GB19970019779 | 18.09.1997 Original published format: GB 9719779 | [2000/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9914298 | Date: | 25.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1017774 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D3/395 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
C11D3/3792 (EP,US);
C11D3/0063 (EP,US);
C11D3/168 (EP,US);
C11D3/28 (EP,US);
C11D3/37 (EP,US);
C11D3/3776 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/28] | Title | German: | BLEICHMITTEL | [2000/28] | English: | BLEACHING AGENT | [2000/28] | French: | AGENT DE BLANCHIMENT | [2000/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3666680 (BRIGGS BENJAMIN R) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4961755 (BRUTTEL BEAT [CH], et al) [A] 1,2 * claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0333270 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * claims 1-17 * |