EP1012936 - RAPID INTERCONNECT COMMUNICATIONS INFRASTRUCTURE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barnes Wentworth Room 701, 245 Fifth Avenue New York, NY 10016 / US | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUSER, Herb 301 West 53rd Street New York, NY 10019 / US | 02 /
HOBBS, Donald 36 School Street Bryantville, MA 02327 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Cozens, Paul Dennis, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Cozens, Paul Dennis, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98940833.1 | 12.08.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998US16560 | Priority number, date | US19970911814 | 15.08.1997 Original published format: US 911814 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9909626 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012936 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
H02G3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/26] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSINFRASTRUKTUR-SYSTEM MIT SCHNELLVERBINDUNG | [2000/26] | English: | RAPID INTERCONNECT COMMUNICATIONS INFRASTRUCTURE SYSTEM | [2000/26] | French: | SYSTEME D'INFRASTRUCTURE DE COMMUNICATIONS A INTERCONNEXION RAPIDE | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 11.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 07.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.04.2000 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   02.05.2000 | 20.04.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   02.05.2000 | 20.04.2000 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   02.05.2000 | 20.04.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   02.05.2000 | 20.04.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   02.05.2000 | 20.04.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   02.05.2000 | 20.04.2000 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   02.05.2000 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.04.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   02.05.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9623340 (HAWORTH INC ;JOHNSON ROSS (US); WILSON HAROLD R (US)) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XA]JPH08331734 ; | [X]EP0276615 (LEPAILLIER PATRICK) [X] 1-4,6-9,11 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0856926 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) [PX] 1-11 * the whole document * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 097, no. 004, & JP08331734 A 19961213 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYST LTD) [X] 1,3-5,7-9 * abstract * [A] 6 |