EP1011654 - A METHOD OF MODULATING CELLULAR ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC 1000 Route 202 Raritan New Jersey 08869 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC 1000 Route 22 Raritan, New Jersey 08869 / US | ||
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Research Pty Limited Level 4, 1 Central Avenue, Australian Technology Park Eveleigh, NSW 1430 / AU | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states MEDVET SCIENCE PTY. LTD. Hanson Centre IMVS, Frome Road Adelaide, S.A. 5000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VADAS, Mathew 8 Branch Road Stirling, S.A. 5152 / AU | 02 /
GAMBLE, Jennifer 8 Branch Road Stirling, S.A. 5152 / AU | 03 /
XIA, Pu 1/225 Beulah Road Beulah Park, S.A. 5067 / AU | 04 /
BARTER, Philip 49 Ormond Grove Toorak Gardens, S.A. 5065 / AU | 05 /
RYE, Kerry-Anne 49 Ormond Grove Toorak Gardens, S.A. 5065 / AU | 06 /
WATTENBERG, Brian 137 Sheoak Road Belair, S.A. 5052 / AU | 07 /
PITSON, Stuart 4/19 Desaumarez Street Kensington Park, S.A. 5068 / AU | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [2014/14] |
Former [2000/26] | Shah, Punita, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98941157.4 | 08.09.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998AU00730 | Priority number, date | AU1997PO09002 | 08.09.1997 Original published format: AU PO900297 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9912533 | Date: | 18.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1011654 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/13, A61K35/14, A61K38/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
G01N33/5308 (EP);
A61K38/1709 (EP);
A61K38/45 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12Q1/34 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/45, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/45, A61K31/66 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | METHODEN ZUR MODULIERUNG DER ZELL AKTIVITÄT | [2000/26] | English: | A METHOD OF MODULATING CELLULAR ACTIVITY | [2000/26] | French: | PROCEDE DE MODULATION DE L'ACTIVITE CELLULAIRE | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 04.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/30] | 02.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XP]JP10182627 ; | [XP]JP10101630 ; | [X]US4766111 (CATSIMPOOLAS NICHOLAS [US]); | [X]WO8809345 (ROGOSIN INST [US]); | [X]WO9007571 (UNIV EMORY [US]); | [X]EP0381514 (BIOMEMBRANE INST [US], et al); | [X]WO9503039 (BIOMEMBRANE INST [US]); | [X]US5466716 (IGARASHI YASUYUKI [US], et al); | [X]WO9620710 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [X]WO9701752 (ONCOMEMBRANE INC [US]) | [XP] - DERWENT ABSTRACT, Accession No. 98-433849/37, Class B02, D16; & JP,A,10 182 627 (SANKYO CO LTD) 7 July 1998., & JP10182627 A 19980707 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; & JP,A,10 101 630 (SANKYO CO LTD) 21 April 1998., & JP10101630 A 19980421 |