EP1012208 - CROSS-LINKED PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Access Pharmaceuticals Australia Pty Ltd. 28 Barcoo Street Roseville, NSW 2069 / AU | [2003/08] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states BIOTECH AUSTRALIA PTY. LIMITED 28 Barcoo Street, P.O. Box 20 Roseville, NSW 2069 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSSELL-JONES, Gregory, John 23 Greenfield Avenue Middle Cove, NSW 2068 / AU | 02 /
STARLING, Scott, Mathew 11 Kingsland Road Bexley, NSW 2207 / AU | 03 /
McEWAN, John, Fergus 3/3 Letitia Street Oatley, NSW 2223 / AU | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Keller, Günter, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98941647.4 | 28.08.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998IB01464 | Priority number, date | AU1997PO08880 | 29.08.1997 Original published format: AU PO888097 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9911703 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012208 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08L1/28, C08L5/04, C08L77/04, C08L89/06, C08G69/10, C08B15/10, C08J3/24, A61K9/52, C08B37/00 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
A61K9/5161 (EP,KR,US);
C08L1/286 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/5169 (EP,KR,US);
C08B15/005 (EP,KR,US);
C08L5/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L89/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2666/02 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L1/286, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L5/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L89/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/26] | C08L1/28, C08L5/04, C08L77/04, C08L89/06, C08G69/10, C08B15/10, C08J3/24, A61K9/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | VERNETZTE PARTIKEL | [2000/26] | English: | CROSS-LINKED PARTICLES | [2000/26] | French: | PARTICULES RETICULEES | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 28.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 28.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/30] | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2002 | 31.08.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2004 | 31.08.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5870829 ; | [A]JPS4934301B ; | [A]EP0038985 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 45 * abstract *; | [X]US4419444 (QUASH GERARD A [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,10-12,14,15,17,18 * column 3, line 35 - line 44 * * column 3, line 65 - line 68 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 35 * * column 6, line 42 - line 54 * * examples 6,17 *; | [X]EP0381543 (BIOETICA SA [FR]) [X] 3,11-13,30 * page 3, line 28 - line 36 * * page 4, line 27 - line 31 * * example 1 * * claims 1,9,10,25 *; | [X]EP0716882 (JAPAN EXLAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * examples 1,4 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 23, Database accession no. 1983-54658k, XP002229847 & JPS5870829 A 19830427 (OJI PAPER CO) [X] 40,41 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1974, no. 41, Database accession no. 1974-71937v, XP002229848 & JPS4934301B B1 19740913 (TOMOEGAWA PAPER MFG CO) [A] 51 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP02235902 ; | [X]US5284936 (DONACHY JULIE [US], et al); | [X]AU7556594 (VITAPHORE CORP); | [X]AU5463896 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO); | [XP]AU3585397 (SEARLE & CO) | [X] - DERWENT ABSTRACT, Accession No. 90-326123; & JP,A,02 235 902 (NISSHIN SPINNING KK) 18 September 1990., & JP02235902 A 19900918 |