EP1016741 - POLYESTER FIBER AND FABRICS MADE BY USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): FR, IT | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Fibers Limited 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [2010/41] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Jinichiro 333, Higashiasahi Apartment 34, Sakurazono-cho Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0036 / JP | 02 /
FUJIMOTO, Katsuhiro 122, Sakurazono Apartment 22, Sakurazono-cho Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0036 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Tetsuko 531, Higashiasahi Apartment 35, Sakurazono-cho Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0036 / JP | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2000/27] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98941707.6 | 03.09.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998JP03960 | Priority number, date | JP19970252686 | 03.09.1997 Original published format: JP 25268697 | [2000/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9911845 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016741 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016741 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/62, D01F6/84, C08L67/02, C08G63/672, C08G63/682 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
D01F6/84 (EP,US);
D01F6/62 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/183 (EP,US);
C08G63/672 (EP,US);
C08K5/52 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/52, C08L67/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | POLYESTERFASER UND GEWEBE DARAUS | [2000/27] | English: | POLYESTER FIBER AND FABRICS MADE BY USING THE SAME | [2000/27] | French: | FIBRES POLYESTER ET TISSU FABRIQUE A PARTIR DE CES FIBRES | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2000 | Translation filed | 17.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 24.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.10.2005
07.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 16 2596 HR The Hague / NL Opponent's representative McKinney, Victoria, et al, et al Shell International Limited Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 662 London SE1 7NE / GB | 02
26.10.2005
07.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Zimmer AG Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.10.2005
07.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR The Hague / NL Opponent's representative McKinney, Victoria, et al, et al Shell International Limited Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 662 London SE1 7NE / GB | ||
02
26.10.2005
07.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Zimmer AG Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2006/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.10.2005
07.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Overton, John Michael, et al, et al Shell International Limited, Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 662 London SE1 7NE / GB | ||
02
26.10.2005
07.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Zimmer AG Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2005/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.10.2005
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Wilson, Michael John, et al, et al Shell International Limited Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 662 London SE1 7NE / GB | ||
02
26.10.2005
ADMISSIBLE Zimmer AG Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2005/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.10.2005
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Wilson, Michael John, et al, et al Shell International Limited Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 662 London SE1 7NE / GB | 01.12.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.07.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.05.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.09.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 27.09.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/09] | 27.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 18.08.2008 | Appeal received No. T1591/08 | 28.10.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.09.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 22.08.2008 | Appeal received No. T1591/08 | 27.10.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.09.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 27.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.10.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.01.2005 | BE | 26.01.2005 | CH | 26.01.2005 | FI | 26.01.2005 | LI | 26.01.2005 | NL | 26.01.2005 | DK | 26.04.2005 | GR | 26.04.2005 | SE | 26.04.2005 | PT | 26.06.2005 | CY | 03.09.2005 | IE | 05.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | GB | 03.09.2008 | IT | 03.09.2011 | FR | 30.09.2011 | [2015/21] |
Former [2010/06] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
PT | 26.06.2005 | ||
CY | 03.09.2005 | ||
IE | 05.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
GB | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
PT | 26.06.2005 | ||
CY | 03.09.2005 | ||
IE | 05.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
CY | 03.09.2005 | ||
IE | 05.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/18] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
IE | 05.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
IE | 05.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 26.01.2005 | |
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 26.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - TRAUB, H. L. ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND PROPERTIES OF FIBER-GRADE POLY(TRIMETHYLENE TEREPHTHALATE)", ANGEWANDTE MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE. APPLIED MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS,DE,WILEY VCH,WEINHEIM, (19950801), vol. 230, ISSN 0003-3146, pages 179 - 187, XP000535894 [Y] 1,3,6,9 * page 181 - page 182 * * page 187 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/apmc.1995.052300113 | [Y] - JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: POLYMER PHYSICS EDITION, (1976), vol. 14, pages 263 - 274, XP002153418 [Y] 1,3,6,9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pol.1976.180140206 | International search | [A]US3907754 (TERSHANSY RONALD A, et al); | [A]JPS51142098 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JPS52105591 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [A]JPH05262862 ; | [A]JPH08311177 (NIPPON ESTER CO LTD) |