EP1012032 - POWER UNIT ARRANGEMENT STRUCTURE FOR MOTORCYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUTO, Takushi, Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0113 / JP | 02 /
WACHIGAI, Kaoru, Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0113 / JP | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/26] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98941760.5 | 08.09.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998JP04018 | Priority number, date | JP19970268074 | 14.09.1997 Original published format: JP 26807497 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9914108 | Date: | 25.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012032 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1012032 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B62M7/12, B62M23/02, B60K6/02 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
B62M7/12 (EP,KR,US);
B60L15/2054 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US);
B60L2240/12 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/441 (EP,US);
B60L2240/443 (EP,US);
B60L2240/486 (EP,US);
B62K2202/00 (EP,US);
F02B2075/027 (EP,US);
F02B61/02 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSEINHEIT- ANORDNUNGSSTRUKTUR FÜR MOTORRAD | [2000/50] | English: | POWER UNIT ARRANGEMENT STRUCTURE FOR MOTORCYCLE | [2000/26] | French: | STRUCTURE D'AGENCEMENT DE BLOC-MOTEUR POUR MOTOCYCLE | [2000/26] |
Former [2000/26] | ANTRIEBSEINHEIT- ANORDNUNGSSRUKTUR FÜR MOTORRAD | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 04.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB800488 (NSU WERKE AG) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 37 - line 42; figure - * [Y] 3; | [X]JPS6092929 ; | [X]US4697664 (KOHYAMA MIKIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 3,4; claim 1 *; | [YD]JPH08175477 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850925), vol. 009, no. 238, Database accession no. (M - 416), & JP60092929 A 19850524 (YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KK) [X] 1,4 * abstract * | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 096, no. 011, & JP08175477 A 19960709 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [YD] 3 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH08175477 |