EP1030355 - PRESS CONTACT SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATOH, Katsumi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2007/42] |
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
SATOH, Katsumi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chioda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
Former [2000/34] | 01 /
SATOH, Katsumi, Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/34] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98941836.3 | 10.09.1998 | [2000/34] | WO1998JP04104 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0016394 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1030355 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1030355 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/52 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
H01L23/051 (EP,US);
H01L24/72 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0102 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01024 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/1301, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2000/34] | Title | German: | DRUCKKONTAKT-HALBLEITERANORDNUNG | [2000/34] | English: | PRESS CONTACT SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2000/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR A CONTACT PAR PRESSION | [2000/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2000 | Translation filed | 17.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 10.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0746021 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * column 7, line 15 - column 12, line 10; figure 1 * [A] 2-7; | [A]US5345096 (GRUENING HORST [CH]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS63236360 ; | [A]DE3616185 (SEMIKRON ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 3, lines 11-36 * * column 5, lines 39-47 *; | [A]JPH1022433 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890127), vol. 013, no. 038, Database accession no. (E - 709), & JP63236360 A 19881003 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10022433 A 19980123 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH09201039 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]JPH08330572 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH04352457 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH07312420 (TOYO ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [A]JPH08186135 (TOYO ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [A]JPH05218397 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) |