EP1007404 - BICYCLE BRAKE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hayes Brake, Inc. 5800 West Donges Bay Road Mequon, WI 53092-4429 / US | [2000/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCKLEY, James, A. 5111 North Idlewild Avenue Whitefish Bay, WI 53217 / US | 02 /
HINKENS, George, H. 10312 North Stanford Drive Mequon, WI 53097 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Korey 1711 South 81st Street West Allis, WI 53214 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98942221.7 | 24.08.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998US17487 | Priority number, date | US19970920495 | 29.08.1997 Original published format: US 920495 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9910225 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1007404 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007404 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B62L3/00 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
F16D55/228 (EP,US);
B60T11/22 (EP,US);
B62K23/06 (EP,US);
B62L1/005 (EP,US);
B62L3/02 (EP,US);
B62L3/023 (EP,US);
F16D65/092 (EP,US);
F16D65/12 (EP,US);
F16D2055/002 (EP,US);
F16D2065/1348 (EP,US);
F16D2121/02 (EP,US);
F16D2125/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/24] | Title | German: | FAHRRADBREMSSYSTEM | [2000/24] | English: | BICYCLE BRAKE SYSTEM | [2000/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE FREINAGE POUR BICYCLETTE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04012242.6 / EP1447314 | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   04.12.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE29707918U (MAGENWIRTH GMBH CO GUSTAV [DE]) [A] 1,10 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US1717520 (REILLY FRANK C) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 86; figure 1 *; | [A]US2310976 (MASTELLER MALCOLM L) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 23 - column 2, line 54; figure 1 *; | [A]WO8907540 (AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC [GB]) [A] 1,10 * figures 10,19,21; claim 1 *; | [A]US3216198 (BROOKS FRANK W) [A] 1,10 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]JPS5986724 ; | [A]FR2032528 (LEBOUR ARNAUD) [A] 14,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4705145 (GOULART JOSEPH F [US]) [A] 14,15 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 10; figures 4,5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840911), vol. 008, no. 197, Database accession no. (M - 324), & JP59086724 A 19840519 (YOSHIKAWA SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] 14,15 * abstract * | by applicant | US19960638526 |