EP0994759 - COMPASS SAW DEVICE WITH EJECTOR FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krieg, Siegmund Mozartstrasse 12 74629 Pfedelbach / DE | For all designated states Ehmann, Karl Bahnhofstrasse 7 74626 Bretzfeld / DE | [2000/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Clemens, Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 74074 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Clemens, Gerhard, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwaltskanzlei, Müller, Clemens & Hach, Lerchenstrasse 56 74074 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 98942498.1 | 07.07.1998 | [2000/17] | WO1998DE01869 | Priority number, date | DE1997212056U | 09.07.1997 Original published format: DE 29712056 U | DE1997217694U | 04.10.1997 Original published format: DE 29717694 U | [2000/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9902292 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0994759 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0994759 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/04 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
B23B51/0453 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/17] | Title | German: | LOCHSÄGENEINRICHTUNG MIT AUSWERFEREINRICHTUNG | [2000/17] | English: | COMPASS SAW DEVICE WITH EJECTOR FACILITY | [2000/17] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE SCIE D'ENTREE AVEC DISPOSITIF D'EJECTION | [2000/17] | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 13.07.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.08.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 24.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 27.03.2002 | FR | 27.03.2002 | GB | 27.03.2002 | IE | 27.03.2002 | IT | 27.03.2002 | NL | 27.03.2002 | DK | 27.06.2002 | PT | 27.06.2002 | SE | 27.06.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
FR | 27.03.2002 | ||
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.06.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2349400 (BECKWITH WENDELL K) [X] 1-3,6-14,16-18,21 * page 2; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR1062899 (DAVUM); | [A]CA1230763 (ST PIERRE MICHEL); | [A]US4755087 (PARENT PHILIP V [US]); | [X]FR2668405 (THIEBLEMONT GEORGES) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5226762 (ECKER ROBERT J [US]) |