EP1007474 - PROCESS FOR STABILISING PARTICULATE ALKALI METAL PERCARBONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [2000/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORNE, Graham R. 33 Shanklin Close, Great Sankey, Warrington Cheshire WA5 3JN / GB | 02 /
JAMES, Alun P. 28 Dowhills Road, Blundellsands Liverpool L23 8SW / GB | 03 /
BAKER, Daniel R. 28 Warburton Street, Stockton Heath, Warrington Cheshire WA4 2VG / GB | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2001/27] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2000/24] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al SOLVAY S.A., Dép. de la Prop. Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 98942670.5 | 31.07.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998EP04965 | Priority number, date | GB19970016139 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: GB 9716139 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9906321 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007474 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007474 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C01B15/10 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
C11D3/221 (EP,US);
C01B15/10 (KR);
C01B15/106 (EP,US);
C11D17/0039 (EP,US);
C11D3/3942 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STABILISIEREN VON TEILIGEM ALKALIMETALLPERKARBONAT | [2000/24] | English: | PROCESS FOR STABILISING PARTICULATE ALKALI METAL PERCARBONATE | [2000/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE STABILISATION DE PERCARBONATES DE METAUX ALCALINS EN PARTICULES | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 24.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.10.2001 | CH | 17.10.2001 | FI | 17.10.2001 | LI | 17.10.2001 | NL | 17.10.2001 | DK | 17.01.2002 | PT | 17.01.2002 | GR | 18.01.2002 | [2004/51] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 17.10.2001 | |
CH | 17.10.2001 | ||
FI | 17.10.2001 | ||
LI | 17.10.2001 | ||
NL | 17.10.2001 | ||
DK | 17.01.2002 | ||
PT | 17.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 17.10.2001 | |
CH | 17.10.2001 | ||
FI | 17.10.2001 | ||
LI | 17.10.2001 | ||
NL | 17.10.2001 | ||
PT | 17.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 17.10.2001 | |
FI | 17.10.2001 | ||
LI | 17.10.2001 | ||
PT | 17.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 17.10.2001 | |
PT | 17.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 17.10.2001 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9518065 (SOLVAY INTEROX LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1 * page 4, line 1 - line 27 *; | [A]WO9523208 (EKA NOVEL AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * claim 7 *; | [A]DE19506004 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 1* column 3, line 44 - line 67 * | Examination | US4009113 | JPH06157010 |