EP1007032 - 4-CYANO-4-DEFORMYLSORDARICIN DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states MERCK & CO., INC. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSE, Bruno 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Thompson, John Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Thompson, John Dr. Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98943230.7 | 18.08.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998US17093 | Priority number, date | US19970056820P | 22.08.1997 Original published format: US 56820 P | GB19970020331 | 24.09.1997 Original published format: GB 9720331 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9909975 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007032 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007032 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/34, A61K31/35, C07D307/06, C07D309/04 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
C07C271/08 (EP);
A01N45/02 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
C07C255/47 (EP);
C07D309/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Extension states | RO | 22.03.2000 | Title | German: | 4-CYANO-4-DEFORMYLSORDARIZIN-DERIVATE | [2000/24] | English: | 4-CYANO-4-DEFORMYLSORDARICIN DERIVATIVES | [2000/24] | French: | DERIVES DE 4-CYANO-4-DEFORMYLSORDARICINE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 09.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 23.04.2003 | NL | 23.04.2003 | DK | 23.07.2003 | GR | 23.07.2003 | PT | 23.07.2003 | SE | 23.07.2003 | CY | 18.08.2003 | IE | 18.08.2003 | LU | 18.08.2003 | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/39] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 18.08.2003 | ||
LU | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 23.04.2003 | |
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 23.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - TSE, BRUNO ET AL, "Alkyl side-chain derivatives of sordaricin as potent antifungal agents against yeast", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT. (1998), 8(16), 2269-2272, (19980818), XP001053103 [PX] 1-16 * page 2271 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00401-6 | International search | [A]EP0711783 (GLAXO SA [ES]) |