EP1025278 - VERTICALLY-STACKED PROCESS REACTOR AND CLUSTER TOOL SYSTEM FOR ATOMIC LAYER DEPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aixtron, Inc. 1139 Karlstadt Drive Sunnyvale CA 94089 / US | [2009/27] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states GENUS, INC. 1139 Karlstad Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GADGIL, Prasad, N. 3840 Granada Avenue 236 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 02 /
SEIDEL, Thomas, E. 965 East El Camino Avenue 933 Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Grundmann, Dirk Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Postfach 11 04 51 42304 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2009/23] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/38] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2000/32] | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al Reginald W. Barker & Co., Cliffords Inn Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BY / GB | Application number, filing date | 98943425.3 | 26.08.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998US17741 | Priority number, date | US19970920708 | 29.08.1997 Original published format: US 920708 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9910558 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1025278 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1025278 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/00, C23C16/54, H01L21/00, C23C16/44 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
C23C16/45546 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/44 (EP,US);
C23C16/4412 (KR);
C23C16/45576 (KR);
C23C16/4586 (KR);
C23C16/54 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/32] | C23C16/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/32] | Title | German: | VERTIKAL GESTAPELTER PROZESS-REAKTOR UND VERBUNDWERKZEUGSYSTEM FÜR ATOM-BESCHICHTUNG | [2000/32] | English: | VERTICALLY-STACKED PROCESS REACTOR AND CLUSTER TOOL SYSTEM FOR ATOMIC LAYER DEPOSITION | [2000/32] | French: | REACTEUR DE TRAITEMENT A EMPILEMENT VERTICAL ET ENSEMBLE D'INSTRUMENTS GROUPES POUR DEPOT EN COUCHES ATOMIQUES | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 02.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   05.11.2004 | 31.08.2006 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09104982 ; | [A]JPH08321470 ; | [A]EP0696653 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claim 5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09104982 A 19970422 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08321470 A 19961203 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD;TOKYO ELECTRON TOHOKU LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4828224 (CRABB RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]US4836138 (ROBINSON MCDONALD [US], et al); | [A]US4846102 (OZIAS ALBERT E [US]); | [A]US5077875 (HOKE WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [A]US5194401 (ADAMS DAVID V [US], et al); | [A]JPH05152215 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]US5336327 (LEE HSING-CHUNG [US]); | [AP]US5749974 (HABUKA HITOSHI [JP], et al); | [AP]US5788447 (YONEMITSU SHUJI [JP], et al) |