EP1016049 - APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR VERIFYING HONEST GAMING TRANSACTIONS OVER A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quixotic Solutions Inc. 1837 16th Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20009 / US | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Steven, Benjamin 1812 Riggs Place Washington, DC 20009 / US | 02 /
CAMPBELL, Cheryl, Susan 1837 16th Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20009 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Raynor, Simon Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Midsummer House 413 Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | Strachan, Victoria Jane Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Alexandra House, 1 Alexandra Road Swansea SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 98943493.1 | 01.09.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US18047 | Priority number, date | US19970921520 | 02.09.1997 Original published format: US 921520 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9912135 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016049 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016049 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1016049 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G06Q40/03 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/33] | G07F17/32, G07F19/00 | ||
Former IPC [2000/27] | G07F17/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERIFIZIEREN EHRLICHER SPIELTRANSAKTIONEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2000/27] | English: | APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR VERIFYING HONEST GAMING TRANSACTIONS OVER A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2000/27] | French: | APPAREIL ET UN PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE VERIFIER L'HONNETETE DE TRANSACTIONS DE JEU VIA UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 08.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.11.2006
28.08.2008
WITHDRAWN VALENTINI, Giuliano Via Larga 16 20122 Milano / IT Opponent's representative Valentini, Giuliano, et al, et al Marietti Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.11.2006
28.08.2008
WITHDRAWN VALENTINI, Giuliano Via Larga 16 20122 Milano / IT Opponent's representative Valentini, Giuliano, et al, et al Marietti Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga 16 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2006/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.11.2006
WITHDRAWN VALENTINI, Giuliano Via Larga 16 20122 Milano / IT Opponent's representative Valentini, Giuliano, et al, et al Marietti Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga 16 20122 Milano / IT | 13.03.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.03.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.11.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.12.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.12.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.07.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | 22.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.04.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   10.05.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2006 | BE | 01.02.2006 | CH | 01.02.2006 | CY | 01.02.2006 | FI | 01.02.2006 | LI | 01.02.2006 | NL | 01.02.2006 | DK | 01.05.2006 | SE | 01.05.2006 | GR | 02.05.2006 | PT | 03.07.2006 | IE | 01.09.2006 | LU | 01.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
IE | 01.09.2006 | ||
LU | 01.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
IE | 01.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
IE | 01.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9702073 (WALKER ASSET MANAGEMENT LTD [US]) [X] 19 * page 11, line 13 - line 30 * * page 20, line 4 - line 18; figure - *[A] 1,8,13,15; | [XA]WO9719537 (WALKER ASSET MANAGEMENT L P [US]) [X] 19 * page 1, line 5 - line 30 * * page 6, line 4 - line 30 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 20 * * page 22, line 29 - page 23, line 11; figure - * [A] 1,8,13,15; | [PXA]EP0855685 (NEC CORP [JP]) [PX] 19 * abstract * [A] 1,8,13,15 | by applicant | US5586937 | Opposition | - M. BLUM, ""Coin flipping by telephone: A protocol for solving impossible problems". In Proceedings of the 24th IEEE Computer Conference (CompCon), 1982", pages 175 - 193 | - J. KILIAN:, ""Uses of Randomness in Algorithms and Protocols" MIT Press. 1990" |