EP1019005 - BATH LIFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silver Crown Associates Limited Unit 3, Etruscan Trading Estate, Etruria Road Hanley, Stoke-on-Trent Staffordshire ST1 5NH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Silver Crown Associates Limited Unit 3, Etruscan Trading Estate, Etruria Road Hanley, Stoke-on-Trent, Staffordshire ST1 5NH / GB | ||
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states Silver Crown Associates Limited Unit 3 Etruscan Trading Estate Etruria Road Hanley Stoke-on-Trent Staffordshire ST1 5NH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEADMAN, William David 2145 S.W. Oakwater Pointe Palm City, FL 34990 / US | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Sales, Robert Reginald Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Sales, Robert Reginald Swindell & Pearson, 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 98944083.9 | 22.09.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998GB02865 | Priority number, date | US19970060080P | 25.09.1997 Original published format: US 60080 P | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9915127 | Date: | 01.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019005 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1019005 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/10 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
A61G7/1003 (EP,US);
A61G7/1015 (EP,US);
A61G7/1044 (EP,US);
A61G2200/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2000/29] | Title | German: | BADEWANNENLIFT | [2000/29] | English: | BATH LIFT | [2000/29] | French: | ELEVATEUR POUR BAIGNOIRE | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 10.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.12.2003 | FR | 03.12.2003 | IT | 03.12.2003 | NL | 03.12.2003 | DE | 04.03.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 03.12.2003 | |
FR | 03.12.2003 | ||
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
DE | 04.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/12] | BE | 03.12.2003 | |
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
DE | 04.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | BE | 03.12.2003 | |
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | NL | 03.12.2003 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3317928 (ANTON ROOT) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 46; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 24,25; | [A]EP0403235 (EXTEND A CARE LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1,5,30-33,36 * column 8, line 54 - column 9, line 10; figure 5 *; | [A]WO9100080 (SCHRAMMEL MORITZ [DE]) [A] 1,5,30* abstract * |