EP0980574 - PATTERN RECOGNITION ENROLMENT IN A DISTRIBUTED SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESLING, Stefan Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
THELEN, Eric Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al International Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / DE | ||
Former [2000/08] | Hoekstra, Jelle, et al Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 98944185.2 | 08.10.1998 | [2000/08] | WO1998IB01566 | Priority number, date | EP19970203267 | 20.10.1997 Original published format: EP 97203267 | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9921172 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0980574 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0980574 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/28 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
G10L15/34 (EP,US);
G06F18/21 (EP,US);
G10L15/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/08] | G10L5/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/08] | Title | German: | MUSTERERKENNUNGSREGISTRIERUNG IN EINEM VERTEILTEM SYSTEM | [2000/08] | English: | PATTERN RECOGNITION ENROLMENT IN A DISTRIBUTED SYSTEM | [2000/08] | French: | IMMATRICULATION DE RECONNAISSANCES DE FORMES DANS UN SYSTEME DISTRIBUE | [2000/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/08] | 12.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4773093 (HIGGINS ALAN L [US], et al); | [Y]US4922538 (TCHORZEWSKI KAZIMIERZ [GB]); | [A]US5182765 (ISHII TAKAAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US5199077 (WILCOX LYNN D [US], et al); | [A]EP0661690 (IBM [US]); | [XP]WO9822936 (T NETIX INC [US]) |