EP1109682 - RUNFLAT ALL TERRAIN TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROONEY, Timothy, Michael 20 Glenside Drive Munroe Falls, OH 44262 / US | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [2001/26] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center, Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 98944691.9 | 02.09.1998 | [2001/26] | WO1998US18256 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0013923 | Date: | 16.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1109682 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109682 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60C17/00, B60C9/18, B60C11/13, // (B60C121/00, 103:00, 105:00, 107:02) | [2001/26] | CPC: |
B60C11/0309 (EP);
B60C11/0311 (EP);
B60C11/033 (EP);
B60C11/042 (EP);
B60C11/13 (EP);
B60C17/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/26] | Title | German: | NOTLAUFGELÄNDEREIFEN | [2001/26] | English: | RUNFLAT ALL TERRAIN TIRE | [2001/26] | French: | PNEU TOUT TERRAIN AVEC POSSIBILITE DE ROULAGE A PLAT | [2001/26] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02237805 ; | [A]US4687037 (REESE THORSTEN ET AL) [A] 1,11 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 10 * * figure - *; | [A]FR2425334 (KLEBER COLOMBES) [A] 1,11 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 8 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9803356 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER ;ROONEY TIMOTHY MICHAEL (US)) [A] 1,11 * page 2, line 28 - line 33 * * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 23 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5549146 (TRABANDT HAGEN ET AL) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 6 - line 18 * * column 3, line 42 - line 53 * * figures 3A,3B,4,6 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 49, Database accession no. 90-364253, XP002100632 & JPH02237805 A 19900920 (HOWSHAW R J) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure . * |