EP1027337 - INTEGRIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEERDING, Dirk, A. 1 Mill Creek Lane Malvern, PA 19355 / US | 02 /
SAMANEN, James, M. 145 Jug Hollow Road Phoenixville, PA 19460 / US | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Valentine, Jill Barbara, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Valentine, Jill Barbara, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98944735.4 | 03.09.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998US18379 | Priority number, date | US19970057529P | 04.09.1997 Original published format: US 57529 P | US19970063520P | 29.10.1997 Original published format: US 63520 P | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9911626 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027337 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D223/20, A61K31/55, C07D413/12 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/33] | C07D223/20, A61K31/55 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/33] | Title | German: | INTEGRIN-REZEPTOR-ANTAGONISTEN | [2000/33] | English: | INTEGRIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS | [2000/33] | French: | ANTAGONISTES DES RECEPTEURS D'INTEGRINES | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 25.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/50] | 09.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/50] | Request for further processing for: | 05.08.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.08.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1510324 (THOMAE GMBH DR K) [X] 1 * page 1, column 1 - page 2, column 3 *; | [X]BE632563 (CIBA SA, BÂLE) [X] 1 * starting material (IX) p.8 with the definition of Ph1 and Ph2 of the generic disclosure p.1-2 *; | [X]EP0419861 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO9701540 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO9830542 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [PY] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO9504057 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [DY] 1-10 * see abstract, claim 1, formula (I) and (II) * | [X] - NAGARAJAN, K. ET AL, "Condensed heterotricycles. Potential metabolites of dibenz[b,f][1,4]oxazepine antidepressant, Sintamil", INDIAN J. CHEM. (1974), 12(3), 270-4, XP001055872 [X] 1,2 * page 271; examples 28,29 * | International search | [A]US5512563 (ALBRIGHT JAY D [US], et al); | [A]US4551451 (PESTELLINI VITTORIO [IT], et al); | [A]US3905977 (SIMON EDWARD, et al) |