EP1027037 - PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATION COMPRISING CLODRONATE AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT AND SILICIFIED MICROCRYSTALLINE CELLULOSE AS EXCIPIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Oy Pansiontie 47 20210 Turku / FI | [2003/29] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states LEIRAS OY Pansiontie 45-47 20210 Turku / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHTOLA, Veli-Matti Ilkanrinne 2 A 16 FIN-20810 Turku / FI | 02 /
RANTALA, Eeva-Maria, Susanne Joukahaisentie 17 FIN-21530 Paimio / FI | 03 /
RANTALA, Pertti, Tapani Kierrekuja 3 FIN-20660 Littoinen / FI | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Grew, Eva Regina, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6-A 00120 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Grew, Eva Regina, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6-A 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98945336.0 | 18.09.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998FI00735 | Priority number, date | FI19970003733 | 19.09.1997 Original published format: FI 973733 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9915155 | Date: | 01.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027037 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027037 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/48, A61K47/38, A61K31/66 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
A61K31/663 (EP);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61K9/2009 (EP);
A61K9/2054 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Extension states | LT | 13.03.2000 | LV | 13.03.2000 | MK | 13.03.2000 | RO | 13.03.2000 | SI | 13.03.2000 | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL, DAS CLODRONAT ALS WIRKSTOFF UND MIT SILICIUMDIOXID BEHANDELTE MIKROKRISTALLINE CELLULOSE ALS FÜLLSTOFF ENTHÄLT | [2003/18] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATION COMPRISING CLODRONATE AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT AND SILICIFIED MICROCRYSTALLINE CELLULOSE AS EXCIPIENT | [2000/33] | French: | PREPARATION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT DU CLODRONATE EN TANT QUE PRINCIPE ACTIF ET DE LA CELLULOSE MICROCRISTALLINE SILICIFIEE EN TANT QU'EXCIPIENT | [2000/33] |
Former [2000/33] | ARZNEIMITTEL, DAS CLODRONAT ALS WIRKSTOFF UND MIT SILICIUMDIOXID BEHANDELTE MIKROKRISTALLINE CELLULOSE ALS FÜLLSSTOFF ENHÄLT | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 13.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 30.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9426310 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO9513054 (LEIRAS OY [FI], et al); | [X]WO9621429 (MENDELL CO INC EDWARD [US]) |