EP1031044 - ELECTRO-CHEMICAL DETERIORATION TEST METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEM HEME LIMITED 1 Penketh Place West Pimbo Skelmersdale Lancs WN8 9QX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states LEM HEME LIMITED 1 Penketh Place West Pimbo Skelmersdale Lancs WN8 9QX / GB | ||
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states Guardian Link Limited 57a Kings Road, Pownall Park Wilmslow, Cheshire SK9 5PW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCOTT, Nigel David 57a Kings Road, Pownall Park Wilmslow, Cheshire SK9 5PW / GB | 02 /
Wellstead, Peter Eric 14 Ley Hey Road Marple, Stockport SK6 6PO / GB | 03 /
Schooling, Steven Paul 88 Seaforth Gardens Stoneleigh Epson Surrey, KT19 0NP / GB | [2002/35] |
Former [2000/35] | 01 /
SCOTT, Nigel David 57a Kings Road, Pownall Park Wilmslow, Cheshire SK9 5PW / GB | Representative(s) | Ajello, Michael John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Ajello, Michael John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11C Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | ||
Former [2003/13] | Ajello, Michael John, et al Harrison, Goddard, Foote, 11c Compstall Road, Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | ||
Former [2000/35] | Ajello, Michael John Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Greg's Buildings 1 Booth Street Manchester M2 4DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98945414.5 | 02.10.1998 | [2000/35] | WO1998GB02949 | Priority number, date | GB19970020835 | 02.10.1997 Original published format: GB 9720835 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918448 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1031044 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031044 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
G01R31/389 (EP);
G01R31/3648 (EP);
G01R31/379 (EP);
G01R31/392 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHES VERSCHLECHTERUNGSPRÜFVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2000/35] | English: | ELECTRO-CHEMICAL DETERIORATION TEST METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2000/35] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE D'ESSAI D'UNE DETERIORATION ELECTROCHIMIQUE | [2000/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 16.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2001 | 31.10.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 06.05.2004 | CY | 06.05.2004 | FI | 06.05.2004 | IT | 06.05.2004 | LI | 06.05.2004 | NL | 06.05.2004 | DK | 06.08.2004 | GR | 06.08.2004 | SE | 06.08.2004 | ES | 17.08.2004 | LU | 02.10.2004 | IE | 04.10.2004 | PT | 06.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | CH | 06.05.2004 | |
CY | 06.05.2004 | ||
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
NL | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
LU | 02.10.2004 | ||
IE | 04.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | CH | 06.05.2004 | |
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
NL | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | CH | 06.05.2004 | |
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | CH | 06.05.2004 | |
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | CH | 06.05.2004 | |
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 06.05.2004 | |
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 06.05.2004 | |
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 06.05.2004 | |
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 06.05.2004 | |
LI | 06.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3873911 (CHAMPLIN KEITH S) [A] 1-14; | [X]GB2175700 (SECR DEFENCE) [X] 1-6,8-12,14; | [X]US4697134 (BURKUM MERLIN E [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,14; | [A]WO9322666 (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US])[A] 1-14; | [X]US5598098 (CHAMPLIN KEITH S [US]) [X] 1-6,8-12,14 |