EP1025032 - OUTSIDE RESCUE ELEVATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hershtik, Arie 24,HaGevurah HaYehudit St. Rishon Le-Zion 75281 / IL | [2000/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Browne, Robin Forsythe Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr. Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 98945514.2 | 17.09.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998IL00456 | Priority number, date | IL19970122059 | 28.10.1997 Original published format: IL 12205997 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9921788 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1025032 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B66B9/00 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
B66B9/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | AUSSEN-RETTUNGSAUFZUGSYSTEM | [2000/32] | English: | OUTSIDE RESCUE ELEVATOR SYSTEM | [2000/32] | French: | SYSTEME D'ASCENSEUR DE SECOURS EXTERIEUR | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 24.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/41] | 11.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4018306 (LYONS MERLYN E) [DA] 1-19 * column 8, line 5 - line 31 * * column 9, line 30 - column 10, line 5 * * figures 23,24,32,33 ** figures 35,36 *; | [XA]US4386680 (REED WAYMON B) [X] 1,2,5,7,10,17 * column 2, line 31 - line 57 * * column 5, line 40 - line 56 * * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 16 * * figures 2,5A-5D * [A] 3,4,6,8,9,11-16,18,19; | [DA]US4469198 (CRUMP ROBERT F [US]) [DA] 1-19 * abstract * * column 7, line 60 - column 9, line 16 * * figures 6,7 *; | [A]US4640384 (KUCHER ALEXANDER [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 2, line 17 - line 36 * | by applicant | US745915 | US780711 | US1138902 | US2618361 | US3517774 | US4018306 | US4315456 | US4469498 |