EP0964415 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2009/29] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGARASHI, Katsuhiko-TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome,Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 02 /
MASUDA, Sunao-TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome,Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 03 /
UCHIDA, Tomoko-TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome,Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 04 /
TOKUOKA, Yasumichi-TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome,Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 05 /
SATO, Shigeki-TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome,Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Wise, Stephen James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Wise, Stephen James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | Wise, Stephen James, et al Raworth Moss & Cook Raworth House 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | ||
Former [1999/50] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Raworth, Moss & Cook, Raworth House, 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CRO 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 98945643.9 | 06.10.1998 | [1999/50] | WO1998JP04521 | Priority number, date | JP19970289110 | 06.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28911097 | JP19970311460 | 27.10.1997 Original published format: JP 31146097 | JP19970361775 | 10.12.1997 Original published format: JP 36177597 | JP19980102168 | 30.03.1998 Original published format: JP 10216898 | [1999/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918588 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964415 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964415 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01G4/12, H01C13/00 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
H01C1/142 (EP,US);
H01G4/12 (KR);
H01C17/006 (EP,US);
H01C7/18 (EP,US);
H01G4/2325 (EP,US);
H01G4/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/50] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | [1999/50] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [1999/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1999/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.1999 | Translation filed | 28.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 28.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 15.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 15.07.2009 | GB | 15.10.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | [2011/26] |
Former [2010/44] | NL | 15.07.2009 | |
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | NL | 15.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JPH04337616 ; | [YX]JPH0513266 | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930413), vol. 017, no. 188, Database accession no. (E - 1349), & JP04337616 A 19921125 (TAIYO YUDEN CO LTD) [YD] 1-38 * abstract * | [YX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930526), vol. 017, no. 272, Database accession no. (E - 1371), & JP05013266 A 19930122 (MURATA MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1-38 * abstract * [X] 28-38 | International search | [A]JPH01316923 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH04154104 (HITACHI AIC INC); | [Y]JPH053131 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JPH0513266 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [AE]JPH10312934 (TDK CORP) |