EP1018428 - LARGE FORMAT INK-JET COLOUR PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erastov, Igor Dmitrievich ul. Makarova, 6-8, pos. Kupavna, gor. Zheleznodorozhny, Balaschikhinsky raion Moskovskaya obl., 143990 / RU | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states Erastov, Igor Dmitrievich ul. Makarova, 6-8, pos. Kupavna, gor. Zheleznodorozhny, Balaschikhinsky raion Moskovskaya obl., 143990 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURIKOV, Vladislav Sergeevich 3-ü Dorozhny proezd, 9-1-168 Moscow, 113535 / RU | 02 /
BOKAREV, Aleksandr Viktorovich ul. Zelenogradskaya, 3-158 Moscow, 125413 / RU | 03 /
BURIKOV, Igor Vyacheslavovich ul. Kosmonavta Volkova, 17-2-28 Moscow, 125080 / RU | 04 /
KOZLOV, Vladimir Vasilevich Volokolamskoe sh., 7B-64 Moscow, 125080 / RU | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Zellentin & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Nigerstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Zweibrückenstrasse 15 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/28] | Fischer, Ernst, Dr. Neumannstrasse 66 60433 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 98945670.2 | 17.09.1998 | [2000/28] | WO1998RU00292 | Priority number, date | RU19970116069 | 23.09.1997 Original published format: RU 97116069 | [2000/28] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9915336 | Date: | 01.04.1999 | [1999/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1018428 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 17.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
B41J13/0072 (EP);
B41J2/045 (KR);
B41J11/001 (EP);
B41J11/004 (EP);
B41J15/04 (EP);
B41J15/16 (EP);
B41J15/165 (EP);
B41J19/00 (EP);
B41J2/01 (EP);
B41J3/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/28] | Extension states | LT | 24.03.2000 | LV | 24.03.2000 | RO | 24.03.2000 | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLFARBDRUCKER ZUM GROSSFORMATDRUCKEN | [2000/28] | English: | LARGE FORMAT INK-JET COLOUR PRINTER | [2000/28] | French: | IMPRIMANTE A JETS D'ENCRE COULEUR ET DE GRAND FORMAT | [2000/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2000 | Translation filed | 24.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 24.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 24.09.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 15.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]SU1060098 (HELL RUDOLF DR ING GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4999651 (DUFFIELD PETER L [US], et al); | [A]EP0629503 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [A]US5376957 (GANDY JAMES [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0400652 | US4999651 | US5376957 |