EP1009739 - OXO-SUBSTITUTED COMPOUNDS, PROCESS OF MAKING, AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR INHIBITING PARP ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUILFORD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 6611 Tributary Street Baltimore, Maryland 21224 / US | [2000/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jia-He 27 Warren Manor Court Cockesyville, MD 21030 / US | 02 /
TAYS, Kevin L. Apartment 1415, 6847 Old Waterloo Road Elkridge, MD 21075 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Jie 8513 High Timber Court Ellicott City, MD 21043 / US | [2000/34] |
Former [2000/25] | 01 /
LI, Jia-He 10195-K Woodlake Drive Cockeysville, MD 21030 / US | ||
02 /
TAYS, Kevin L. Apartment 1415, 6847 Old Waterloo Road Elkridge, MD 21075 / US | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Jie 8513 High Timber Court Ellicott City, MD 21043 / US | Representative(s) | Kuhnen, Rainer-Andreas Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Fresing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Kuhnen, Rainer-Andreas Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Fresing / DE | ||
Former [2000/25] | Kuhnen, Rainer Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. Kuhnen & Wacker Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 98945833.6 | 02.09.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998US18195 | Priority number, date | US19970922520 | 03.09.1997 Original published format: US 922520 | US19980079509 | 15.05.1998 Original published format: US 79509 | US19980145180 | 01.09.1998 Original published format: US 145180 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9911624 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1009739 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D221/12, C07D221/16, C07D221/18, A61K31/47, C07D491/04, C07D217/24, C07D237/32, C07D475/02, // (C07D491/04, 317:00), C07D221:00 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
C07D471/06 (EP,US);
C07D217/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D217/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07D221/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D221/18 (EP,KR,US);
C07D237/30 (EP,KR,US);
C07D237/32 (EP,KR,US);
C07D237/34 (EP,KR,US);
C07D239/88 (EP,KR,US);
C07D239/93 (EP,KR,US);
C07D239/94 (EP,KR,US);
C07D475/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07D491/04 (EP,US);
C07F9/6561 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | DURCH KETO GRUPPE SUSTITUIERTE VERBINDUNGEN,VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND METHODE ZUR HEMMUNG DER PARP AKTIVITÄT | [2000/25] | English: | OXO-SUBSTITUTED COMPOUNDS, PROCESS OF MAKING, AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR INHIBITING PARP ACTIVITY | [2000/25] | French: | COMPOSES A SUBSTITUTION OXO, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE, COMPOSITIONS LES CONTENANT, ET METHODES D'INHIBITION DE L'ACTIVITE DE LA POLY(ADENOSINE 5'-DIPHOSPHO-RIBOSE) POLYMERASE | [2000/25] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 19.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/21] | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/21] | Request for further processing for: | 14.02.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 14.02.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.03.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US1880441 (RUDOLF M. HEIDENREICH ET AL) [X] 1-4,7-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US3291801 (MONTGOMERY STEWART R) [X] 1-4,7-11 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2205333 (GUIDOTTI & C SPA LABOR [IT]) [X] 1-11,37-46 * claim - *; | [X]US3932643 (GAUTHIER GEORGE J) [X] 1-11,37-46 * the whole document *; | SU514825 [ ] (A.V.UPADYSSHEVA ET AL); | [A]WO9524379 (CANCER RES CAMPAIGN TECH [GB], et al) [A] 1,37-155 * claim - *; | [A]US5589483 (WEST MICHAEL D [US]) [A] 1,37-155 * the whole document *; | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19761122), vol. 85, no. 21, Database accession no. 159898a, column 531, XP002087394 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - ROBERT GRANGER ET AL, "Transposition de Beckmann de la cis-bicyclo[3.3.0]octanoxime-2", BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE., PARIS FR, (1962), pages 233 - 234, XP002087389 [X] 1,2 * see compound II,page 233 * | [X] - K.APARJITAN ET AL, "Thiaindanones III. Beckmann rearrangement of oximes", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY., PROVO US, (196612), vol. 3, pages 466 - 469, XP002087390 [X] 1,2 * see age 466,compound II,pge 469 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570030415 | [X] - DONALD J. DUMADS, "Total synthesis of peramine", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (1988), vol. 5, no. 20, pages 4650 - 4653, XP002087391 [X] 1,2 * see page 4650,compound 6,page4652 * | [X] - MICHAEL M. ROBISON ET AL, "Reaction of 1-chloroisoquinoline with peracetic acid", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (195807), vol. 23, pages 1071 - 1072, XP002087392 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01101a618 | [X] - ZOFIA TAALIK ET AL, "Some pyridotriazoles and imidazoles", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19650301), vol. 62, no. 5, Database accession no. 5271c, XP002087395 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [ ] - ROCZNIKI CHEM., vol. 38, no. 5, pages 887 - 888 | [X] - HSI-LUNG PAN ET AL, "6(5H)-phenanthridinones.III.Halo-6(5H)phenanthridinones(1,2)", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY., PROVO US, (197006), vol. 7, pages 597 - 605, XP002087393 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570070320 | [X] - N.S.DOKUNIKHIN ET AL, "Derivatives of cyclopenta[k,l,m]phenanthridine", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19780327), vol. 88, no. 13, Database accession no. 89502c, page 505, XP002087396 [X] 1-3,10,12 * abstract * | [ ] - ZH.VSES.KHIM.O-VA, vol. 22, no. 6, pages 706 - 707 | [X] - G.I.MIGACHEV, "Nitration of 4H-cyclopenta[k,l,m]phenanthridin-5-ones", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19810608), vol. 94, no. 23, Database accession no. 192098y, page 637, XP002087397 [X] 1-3,10,12 * abstract * | [ ] - ZH.VSES.KHIM.O-VA, (1981), vol. 26, no. 1, page 100-101v | [AD] - BANASIK M ET AL, "Specific inhibitors of poly(ADP-ribose)synthetase and mono(ADP-ribosyl)transferase", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19920125), vol. 267, no. 3, pages 1569 - 1575, XP000574735 [AD] 1,37-155 * the whole document * | [A] - GRIFFIN R J ET AL, "Novel potent inhibitors of the DNA repair enzyme poly(ADP-ribose)polymerase (PARP)", ANTI-CANCER DRUG DESIGN, (199509), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 507 - 514, XP002065156 [A] 1,37-155 * the whole document * | [AD] - M.J.SUTO ET AL, "Dihydroisoquinolinones:the design and synthesis of a new seies of potent inhibitors of poly(ADP-ribose)polymerase", ANTI-CANCER DRUG DESIGN, (1991), vol. 7, pages 107 - 117, XP002086825 [AD] 1,37-155 * the whole document * |