EP1009413 - USE OF IMMUNOSTIMULATORY OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING ASTHMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/25] | USE OF IMMUNOSTIMULATORY OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR PREVENTING OR REDUCING ANTIGEN-STIMULATED, GRANULOCYTE-MEDIATED INFLAMMATION | ||
[2006/33] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland California 94607-5200 / US | ||
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, California 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAZ, Eyal 13658 Mango Drive Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98945877.3 | 04.09.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998US18382 | Priority number, date | US19970927120 | 05.09.1997 Original published format: US 927120 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9911275 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1009413 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1009413 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, A61K39/385, A61P11/06 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
A61K39/35 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/25] | A61K31/70, A61K39/385 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON IMMUNERREGENDEN OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN ZUR VORBEUGUNG ODER BEHANDLUNG VON ASTHMA | [2006/33] | English: | USE OF IMMUNOSTIMULATORY OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING ASTHMA | [2006/33] | French: | UTILISATION D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES IMMUNOSTIMULANTS POUR LA PREVENTION OU LE TRAITMENT DE L'ASTHME | [2006/33] |
Former [2000/25] | VERWENDUNG VON IMMUNERREGENDEN OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN ZUR VORBEUGUNG OR REDUZIERUNG EINER ANTIGENERREGTEN, GRANULOZYTMEDIIERTEN ENTZÜNDUNG | ||
Former [2000/25] | USE OF IMMUNOSTIMULATORY OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR PREVENTING OR REDUCING ANTIGEN-STIMULATED, GRANULOCYTE-MEDIATED INFLAMMATION | ||
Former [2000/25] | UTILISATION D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES IMMUNOSTIMULANTS POUR LA PREVENTION OU LA REDUCTION DES INFLAMMATIONS A MEDIATION GRANULOCYTAIRE ET STIMULEES PAR DES ANTIGENES | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 10.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2003 | Observations by third parties | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2005 | Observations by third parties | 11.07.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07001453.5 / EP1872786 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.11.2007
22.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE Cytos Biotechnology AG Wagistrasse 25 8952 Schlieren / CH Opponent's representative Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | 02
14.11.2007
22.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE Coley Pharmaceutical Group, Inc. 93 Worcester Street, Suit 101, Wellesley MA 02481 / US Opponent's representative Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.11.2007
22.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE Cytos Biotechnology AG Wagistrasse 25 8952 Schlieren / CH Opponent's representative Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
02
14.11.2007
22.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE Coley Pharmaceutical Group, Inc. 93 Worcester Street, Suit 101, Wellesley MA 02481 / US Opponent's representative Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | |||
Former [2008/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.11.2007
22.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE Cytos Biotechnology AG Wagistrasse 25 8952 Schlieren / CH Opponent's representative Wichmann, Hendrik Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
02
14.11.2007
22.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE Coley Pharmaceutical Group, Inc. 93 Worcester Street, Suit 101, Wellesley MA 02481 / US Opponent's representative Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | |||
Former [2007/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.11.2007
Cytos Biotechnology AG Wagistrasse 25 8952 Schlieren / CH Opponent's representative Wichmann, Hendrik Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 86 08 80 81635 München / DE | ||
02
14.11.2007
Coley Pharmaceutical Group, Inc. 93 Worcester Street, Suit 101, Wellesley MA 02481 / US Opponent's representative Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | 20.12.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.09.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.02.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/15] | Appeal following opposition | 26.01.2010 | Appeal received No. T0159/10 | 31.03.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.02.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 14.02.2007 | LI | 14.02.2007 | [2015/20] | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0468520 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 1-37 * page 2, line 23 - page 5, line 36 *; | [XD]WO9728259 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [XD] 1-37 * page 11, line 5 - page 19, line 9 * * page 33, line 25 - page 47, line 15 *; | [XPD]WO9816247 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [XPD] 1-37 * page 10, line 1 - page 21, line 14 *; | [XP]WO9818810 (UNIV IOWA RES FOUND [US], et al) [XP] 1-37 * page 15, line 8 - page 67, line 9 *; | [A] - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY., BALTIMORE US, (19920615), vol. 148, no. 12, pages 4072 - 4076, XP002098020 [A] * the whole document * |