EP1021155 - WATER DISPERSIBLE PERFLUOROETHER POLYMER ENCAPSULATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISP INVESTMENTS INC. 818 Washington Street Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states ISP INVESTMENTS INC. 818 Washington Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOPOLOW, Stephen, L. 1 Beechtree Lane Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98945998.7 | 10.09.1998 | [2000/30] | WO1998US18805 | Priority number, date | US19970948914 | 10.10.1997 Original published format: US 948914 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918918 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1021155 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1021155 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00, A01N25/28, A61K7/48, A61K47/08, C08G65/00, B01J13/00 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K47/08 (EP,US);
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61K8/70 (EP,US);
A61K8/8176 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61K9/5026 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/30] | A61K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Title | German: | EINGEKAPSELTE WASSERDISPERGIERBARE PERFLUOROETHERPOLYMERE | [2000/30] | English: | WATER DISPERSIBLE PERFLUOROETHER POLYMER ENCAPSULATES | [2000/30] | French: | CAPSULES POLYMERES DE PERFLUORO-ETHER DISPERSIBLES DANS L'EAU | [2000/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 29.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2004 | BE | 18.08.2004 | CH | 18.08.2004 | ES | 18.08.2004 | FI | 18.08.2004 | IT | 18.08.2004 | LI | 18.08.2004 | NL | 18.08.2004 | IE | 10.09.2004 | LU | 10.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | DK | 18.11.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | SE | 18.11.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
ES | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 10.09.2004 | ||
LU | 10.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 10.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 10.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 18.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4803067 (BRUNETTA FABIO [IT], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]FR2664162 (CLARINS [FR]) [A] * page 4, line 6 - line 8 * * page 5, line 1 - line 25; claims 1-5 *; | JPH04300811 [ ] (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [A]EP0511092 (OREAL [FR]) [A] * page 1, line 1 - line 7 * * page 1, line 22 - line 26 * * examples 1-20; claims 1-17 *; | [DA]WO9733559 (ISP INVESTMENTS INC [US]) [DA] * claims 1-19 *; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930322), vol. 118, no. 12, Database accession no. 109422, XP002183305 [A] * abstract * | International search | [A]US2969331 (CARL BRYNKO, et al); | [A]US5455048 (LAHMANI PAUL [FR], et al); | [A]US5459165 (BOLLENS ERIC [FR], et al) |