EP1026944 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXTERMINATING PEST ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grigorov, Grigor Rangelov G.K. "Liulin" Bl.618, Vh.G, Ap.64 1336 Sofia / BG | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Grigorov, Grigor Rangelov G.K. "Liulin" Bl.618, Vh.G, Ap.64 1336 Sofia / BG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [2000/33] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98946173.6 | 05.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998BG00017 | Priority number, date | BG19970101955 | 09.10.1997 Original published format: BG 10195597 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918780 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1026944 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01M23/38 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
A01M1/026 (EP);
A01M1/223 (EP);
A01M23/38 (EP);
A01M31/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Extension states | AL | 04.05.2000 | LT | 04.05.2000 | LV | 04.05.2000 | MK | 04.05.2000 | RO | 04.05.2000 | SI | 04.05.2000 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERNICHTUNG VON UNGEZIEFER | [2000/33] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXTERMINATING PEST ANIMALS | [2000/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'EXTERMINATION D'ANIMAUX RAVAGEURS | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]SU1360684 ; | [A]FR893117 (WUTRICH) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]GB594894 (ELECTRONIC TRAPS INC) [A] 1,5 * page 2, line 84 - page 5, line 29 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2023398 (MUNNS R H) [A] 1,5 * page 1, line 81 - page 2, line 81 * * figure -; claim - *; | [AD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 28, Database accession no. 88-196612, XP002090286 & SU1360684 A 19871223 (STASHEVSKII I I) [AD] 1,5 * abstract * |