EP0998534 - DISPERSION OF TITANIUM PARTICLES COMPRISING A BINDER BASED ON POLYORGANOSILOXANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [2000/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHAUT, Corinne 8, rue Pelée F-75011 Paris / FR | 02 /
CARDINAUD, Denis 10, rue de Delle F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Delenne, Marc, et al Specialty Operations France Intellectual Assets Management 52, rue de la Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | Delenne, Marc, et al RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98946503.4 | 17.07.1998 | [2000/19] | WO1998FR01568 | Priority number, date | FR19970009378 | 22.07.1997 Original published format: FR 9709378 | [2000/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9905231 | Date: | 04.02.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998534 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0998534 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/04, C08K3/22 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C09D183/04, C08L2666/54 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/19] | Extension states | LT | 20.12.1999 | SI | 20.12.1999 | Title | German: | POLYSILOXANBINDEMITTEL-ENTHALTENDE DISPERSION VON TEILCHENFÖRMIGEN TITANDIOXIDEN | [2000/19] | English: | DISPERSION OF TITANIUM PARTICLES COMPRISING A BINDER BASED ON POLYORGANOSILOXANE | [2000/19] | French: | DISPERSION DE PARTICULES DE TITANE COMPRENANT UN LIANT A BASE D'UN POLYORGANOSILOXANE | [2000/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 25.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2001 | FI | 07.11.2001 | GR | 07.11.2001 | NL | 07.11.2001 | DK | 07.02.2002 | PT | 07.02.2002 | SE | 07.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | BE | 31.07.2002 | CH | 31.07.2002 | LI | 31.07.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/51] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 07.11.2001 | |
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 07.11.2001 | |
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 07.11.2001 | |
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 07.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09152230 ; | [X]JPH09100437 ; | [A]FR2431324 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 5, line 15 * * page 15, line 1 - line 6 *; | [A]EP0633064 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO9511751 (HELLER E & CO [US]) [X] 1-14 * claims 1-4,6,10,33-38 * * page 4, line 30 - line 17 * * page 6, line 1 - line 9 * * page 11, line 14 - page 15, line 21 * * page 15, line 23 - page 16, line 32 *; | [X]WO9614932 (TOTO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-14; | [X]WO9629375 (TOTO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-14; | [DA]WO9710185 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR], et al) [DA] 1 * claims 1,3 ** page 4, line 7 - line 30 *; | [PX]EP0792687 (TOTO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-14 * claims 1-25 * * page 2, line 5 - line 8 * * page 5, line 47 - page 6, line 5 *; | [PX]EP0816466 (TOTO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-14 * claims 1,4-8 * * page 2, line 5 - line 10 * * page 7, line 6 - line 37 * * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 32 *; | [PX]WO9803607 (TOTO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1 * abrégé *; | [PX]US5775867 (CHRISTENSON RONALD E [US]) [PX] 1-14 * claims 1-19 *; | [E]EP0857770 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1-14 * claims 1-10 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 097, no. 010, & JP09152230 A 19970610 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 097, no. 008, & JP09100437 A 19970415 (YAMAGATA PREF GOV TECHNO PORISU ZAIDAN;NIPPON OIL & FATS CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |