EP1016127 - A FLUOROMETRIC METHOD FOR INCREASING THE EFFICIENCY OF THE RINSING AND WATER RECOVERY PROCESS IN THE MANUFACTURE OF SEMICONDUCTOR CHIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville, IL 60563-1198 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville Illinois 60563-1198 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENKINS, Brian, V. 12301 Cypress Drive Laurinburg, NC 28352 / US | 02 /
HOOTS, John, E. 1430 Lancaster Avenue St. Charles, IL 60174 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40- 43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2002/03] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Wildman, Harrold, Allen & Dixon 11th Floor, Tower 3, Clements Inn London WC2A 2AZ / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al c/o Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98946942.4 | 10.09.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US18925 | Priority number, date | US19970931556 | 16.09.1997 Original published format: US 931556 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9914798 | Date: | 25.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016127 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016127 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H01L21/02052 (EP,US);
H01L22/00 (KR);
Y10S438/906 (EP,US);
Y10T436/12 (EP,US);
Y10T436/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | FLUOROMETRIEVERFAHREN ZUR SPÜLEFFIZIENZERHÖHUNG UND WASSERRÜCKGEWINNUNGSPROZESS IN DER HALBLEITERCHIPSHERSTELLUNG | [2000/27] | English: | A FLUOROMETRIC METHOD FOR INCREASING THE EFFICIENCY OF THE RINSING AND WATER RECOVERY PROCESS IN THE MANUFACTURE OF SEMICONDUCTOR CHIPS | [2000/27] | French: | PROCEDE FLUORIMETRIQUE D'ACCROISSEMENT DE L'EFFICACITE DU PROCESSUS DE RIN AGE ET DE RECUPERATION D'EAU LORS DE LA FABRICATION DE MICROPLAQUETTE DE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 30.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Request for further processing for: | 17.08.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]JPH07326599 ; | [YA]US4698308 (IKEDA MITSURU [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * abstract * * column 4, lines 21-40 * [A] 10; | [A]US5153674 (BOEBEL FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,8-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0730152 (NALCO CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1,5,8-10* the whole document * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 096, no. 004, & JP07326599 A 19951212 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP;OTHERS: 01) [Y] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * abstract * [A] 10 |