EP1015722 - RATCHETING PAWL LATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOUTHCO, INC. 210 North Brinton Lake Road Concordville, PA 19331 / US | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTONUCCI, Jeffrey L., 7 Bearcroft Avenue Great Meadow Warndon, Worcester WR4 0DR / GB | 02 /
ULISSE, Ralph C., Apartment P-305 620 Ronald Avenue Glassboro, NJ 08028 / US | 03 /
PINKOW, Christopher, J. 3129 William Road Boothwyn, PA 19061 / US | [2000/31] |
Former [2000/27] | 01 /
ANTONUCCI, Jeffrey L., 7 Bearcroft Avenue Great Meadow Warndon, Worcester WR4 0DR / GB | ||
02 /
ULISSE, Ralph C., Apartment P-305 620 Ronald Avenue Glassboro, NJ 08028 / US | |||
03 /
PINKOW, Christopher, J. 151 South Bishop Avenue Secane, PA 19018 / US | Representative(s) | Wablat Lange Karthaus Anwaltssozietät Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | [2010/27] |
Former [2007/32] | Effert, Udo, et al Effert und Kollegen Gross-Berliner Damm 73 E 12487 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Effert, Udo, et al Effert und Kollegen Gross-Berliner Damm 73 E 12487 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2000/27] | Effert, Bressel und Kollegen Radickestrasse 48 12489 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 98946958.0 | 10.09.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US18990 | Priority number, date | US19970928266 | 12.09.1997 Original published format: US 928266 | US19980050806 | 30.03.1998 Original published format: US 50806 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9913189 | Date: | 18.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1015722 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/12, E05B65/20, E05C3/24, // E05B13/10 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
E05B83/30 (EP);
E05B85/10 (EP);
E05B85/18 (EP);
E05C3/24 (EP);
E05B13/101 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/27] | E05C3/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/27] | Title | German: | RIEGEL MIT RATSCHENVERSCHLUSS | [2000/27] | English: | RATCHETING PAWL LATCH | [2000/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE A ENCLIQUETAGE | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 11.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/30] | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 16.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.2002 | 30.09.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   16.10.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS61130576 (SHIRAKI KINZOKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1-39 * figures 2-8 *; | [X]JPH0459274U (?) [X] 1-39 * figures 5-9 *; | [X]JPH07133684 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [X] 1-24,35-39 * figures 8-17 *; | [X]US4969916 (WEINERMAN LEE S [US] ET AL) [X] 1-24,35-39 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4969916 ; | [A]US4911487 |