EP1023135 - MILLING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2002/16] |
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QVARTH, Ingemar Häcklingevägen 52 S-811 91 Valbo / SE | 02 /
ENQUIST, Lars-Erik Smala vägen 3D S-811 32 Sandviken / SE | [2000/34] |
Former [2000/31] | 01 /
QVARTH, Ingemar Häcklingevägen 52 S-811 91 Valbo / SE | ||
02 /
ENQUIST, Lars-Erik Tallbacksvägen 11A S-811 41 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 98948046.2 | 08.10.1998 | [2000/31] | WO1998SE01811 | Priority number, date | SE19970003746 | 15.10.1997 Original published format: SE 9703746 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9919105 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023135 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1023135 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/24, B23B29/06 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
B23C5/2496 (EP,KR,US);
B23C5/2226 (EP,KR,US);
B23C5/24 (EP);
B23C5/2479 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T407/1916 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1918 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/31] | Title | German: | FRÄSER | [2000/31] | English: | MILLING TOOL | [2000/31] | French: | FRAISE DE RAINURAGE | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 29.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 17.07.2002 | [2002/42] | Cited in | International search | [A]US2037642 (SCHIBNER HAROLD F); | [A]US2501293 (SHERIDAN HENRY M); | [A]US3214825 (WILLIAMS THURSTON V); | [A]US3501822 (WILLIAMS THURSTON) |