EP1029129 - SOUNDPROOF WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Velox Werk GmbH Dachberg 10 9422 Maria Rojach / AT | [2000/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FABBRO, René Neufeldweg 7 A-9586 Fürnitz / AT | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Beer, Manfred BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Beer, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Beer Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard Hehenberger Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 98948611.3 | 16.10.1998 | [2000/34] | WO1998AT00246 | Priority number, date | AT19970000702U | 11.11.1997 Original published format: AT 70297 U | [2000/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9924670 | Date: | 20.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1029129 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1029129 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E01F8/00 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
E01F8/0029 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, NL [2000/34] | Extension states | SI | 16.09.1999 | Title | German: | LÄRMSCHUTZWAND | [2000/34] | English: | SOUNDPROOF WALL | [2000/34] | French: | MUR ANTIBRUIT | [2000/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 02.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.08.2002 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 12.09.2002 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 21.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Request for further processing for: | 21.10.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 21.10.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request procedure closed | 12.11.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 14.05.2003 | BE | 31.10.2003 | CH | 31.10.2003 | LI | 31.10.2003 | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/44] | NL | 14.05.2003 | |
CH | 31.10.2003 | ||
LI | 31.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 14.05.2003 | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE7715101U (TUBAG) [Y] 25-27 * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 8, paragraph 4; figure - * [A] 1; | [YA]DE2317812 (N. FRANZ) [Y] 9 * column 3, line 19 - line 41; figure - * [A] 1,2,8; | [YA]CA1210340 (TOEPELL HANS D F) [Y] 15-24 * page 3, line 9 - page 10, line 14; figure - * [A] 1-14; | [YA]DE9113416U (W. ZAHN) [Y] 7-11,13,14 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 3; figure - * [A] 1-6,21-24; | [XAY]US5324469 (WALTER HANSRUEDI [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 42 - column 5, line 12; figure - * [A] 23 [Y] 25-27; | [XY]US5539163 (ANDERSON PETER L [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 17 - line 39; figure - * [Y] 7-11,13-24; | [A]WO9636781 (BOS PIETER R [US]) [A] 1,15-24* abstract * |