EP0932637 - POLYMERIC METAL COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITÄT KARLSRUHE Kaiserstrasse 12 76128 Karlsruhe / DE | [1999/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENZ, Gerhard Lupinenweg 6 D-76275 Ettlingen / DE | 02 /
PETRI, Denise Freitas August-Bebel-Strasse 59 D-76187 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
CHOI, Soo Whan Philippstrasse 17 D-76185 Karlsruhe / DE | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Rucker, Ernst Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Rucker, Ernst, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98948770.7 | 11.08.1998 | [1999/31] | WO1998DE02314 | Priority number, date | DE1997135368 | 14.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19735368 | [1999/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9909088 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0932637 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0932637 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/00, C09D101/08, C23C22/05 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
C08B15/00 (EP,US);
C08B11/10 (EP,US);
C08B11/193 (EP,US);
C08B11/20 (EP,US);
C09D101/08 (EP,US);
C09D101/26 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/31] | C08G75/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/31] | Title | German: | POLYMERE METALLBESCHICHTUNG | [1999/31] | English: | POLYMERIC METAL COATING | [1999/31] | French: | REVETEMENT METALLIQUE POLYMERE | [1999/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 26.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   16.10.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 14.01.2004 | IT | 14.01.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | ES | 14.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2523793 (EXPLOATERINGS AB TBF) [X] 1-7,9-11 * page 3 - page 4; example IV; claims 1,11,12 *; | [Y]DE2260074 (IWS NOMINEE CO LTD) [Y] 1-7,9-12,18 * example 25 * * page 10, line 1 - line 5 *; | [Y]DE3710569 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP]) [Y] 1-7,9-12,18 * siehe das ganse Dokument *; | [A]US5248772 (SIIMAN OLAVI [US], et al) |