EP1017607 - AUTOMATIC CUTTING AND STACKING DEVICE FOR SHAPED BLANKS AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solutia Europe N.V./S.A. Chaussée de Boondael 6 1050 Brussels / BE | [2000/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DE VELDE KEYSER, Herbert, Sybrant Esdoornlaan 42 B-9080 Lochristi / BE | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Colens, Alain M.G.M. Rue Franz Merjay, 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Colens, Alain Rue Franz Merjay, 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 98948927.3 | 08.09.1998 | [2000/28] | WO1998EP05678 | Priority number, date | EP19970870144 | 23.09.1997 Original published format: EP 97870144 | [2000/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9915451 | Date: | 01.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1017607 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1017607 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65H35/00 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
B65H35/0006 (EP);
B65H35/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/28] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE SCHNEID- UND STAPELVORRICHTUNG FÜR GEFORMTE WERKSTÜCKE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DERSELBEN | [2000/28] | English: | AUTOMATIC CUTTING AND STACKING DEVICE FOR SHAPED BLANKS AND METHOD OF USE | [2000/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUTOMATIQUE DE DECOUPE ET D'EMPILAGE D'EBAUCHES FAçONNEES ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [2002/07] |
Former [2000/28] | DISPOSITIF AUTOMATIQUE DE DECOUPE ET D'EMPILAGE D'EBAUCHES FA ONNEES ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 02.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2003 | GR | 26.03.2003 | PT | 26.06.2003 | IE | 08.09.2003 | CH | 30.09.2003 | LI | 30.09.2003 | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
IE | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 26.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3696186 (STARK JOHN E, et al) [A] 1,6 * column W *; | [A]US4554713 (CHABAL JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-3,6 * column 7, line 61 - column 10, line 20; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0317545 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 16 - line 32 * * column 3, line 14 - column 5, line 6 ** column 7, line 9 - line 35; figures 1-3 * |