EP1024694 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING HOUSE DUST MITES AND BEDMITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/32] | METHODS OF CONTROLLING HOUSE DUST MITES AND BEDMITES | ||
[2003/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acordis UK Limited 1 Holme Lane Spondon Derby DE21 7DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Acordis UK Limited 1 Holme Lane Spondon, Derby DE21 7DP / GB | ||
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel UK Limited P.O. Box 20980, Oriel House, 16 Connaught Place London W2 2ZB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COX, Roland 11 Wickersley Close, Darley Abbey Derby DE22 2XT / GB | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Hale, Stephen Geoffrey, et al Bromhead Johnson 19 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Hale, Stephen Geoffrey, et al Bromhead Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | ||
Former [2000/32] | Hale, Stephen Geoffrey, et al JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98949108.9 | 21.10.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998GB03137 | Priority number, date | GB19970022448 | 23.10.1997 Original published format: GB 9722448 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9921421 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1024694 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1024694 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/34, D06M16/00 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
D06M16/00 (EP);
A01N25/34 (EP);
A01N47/22 (EP);
A47G9/00 (EP);
D01F1/103 (EP);
A47G2009/001 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/22, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N47/22, A01N25/34, A01N25/10 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON HAUSSTAUBMILBEN UND BETTMILBEN | [2000/32] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING HOUSE DUST MITES AND BEDMITES | [2003/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DES ACARIENS DE LA POUSSIERE DE MAISON ET DES ACARIENS DU LIT | [2003/37] |
Former [2000/32] | METHODS OF CONTROLLING HOUSE DUST MITES AND BEDMITES | ||
Former [2000/32] | PROCEDES DE CONTROLE DES ACARIENS | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 15.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.02.2004 | GR | 25.05.2004 | [2007/18] |
Former [2004/41] | GR | 25.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0047553 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 11 - line 28 *; | [X]WO9724484 (SOGILO NV [BE], et al) [X] 1-10 * claim - * * page 4, paragraph 3 *; | [YD]GB2309461 (COURTAULDS FIBRES [GB]) [YD] 1-10* claim 13 * |